Case: 14-19-00224-CR
14-19-00224-CR
03/18/2019
Poss or Promotion of Child Pornography
Dustin Michael Allaire
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
11/26/2019 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | State |
| ||||
08/19/2019 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | Appellant |
|
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
04/22/2020 | Mandate issued |
| |||||
04/22/2020 | Case stored | | |||||
04/22/2020 | Mandate due to be issued | | |||||
03/30/2020 | Petition for discretionary review was not filed | | |||||
03/30/2020 | Petition for discretionary review due | | |||||
03/13/2020 | Motion for rehearing was not filed | | |||||
03/13/2020 | Motion for rehearing due | | |||||
02/27/2020 | Judgment Issued |
| |||||
02/27/2020 | Memorandum opinion issued | AFFIRMED |
| ||||
02/26/2020 | Submitted | | |||||
02/04/2020 | Set for submission on briefs |
| |||||
12/02/2019 | State brief due | | |||||
11/26/2019 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested |
| |||||
11/26/2019 | Case ready to be set | | |||||
10/25/2019 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | GRANTED |
| ||||
10/25/2019 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||
10/25/2019 | State brief due | | |||||
10/04/2019 | Response due | | |||||
09/20/2019 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | GRANTED |
| ||||
09/20/2019 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||
09/19/2019 | Notice of late brief |
| |||||
09/18/2019 | State brief due | | |||||
08/29/2019 | Response due | | |||||
08/19/2019 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested |
| |||||
08/19/2019 | Notice of late brief |
| |||||
08/16/2019 | Appellants brief due | | |||||
06/24/2019 | Response due | | |||||
06/17/2019 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | GRANTED |
| ||||
06/17/2019 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | | |||||
06/12/2019 | Notice of late brief |
| |||||
06/10/2019 | Appellants brief due | | |||||
06/03/2019 | Reporters record due | | |||||
05/10/2019 | Reporters record filed |
| |||||
05/02/2019 | Order entered |
| |||||
04/30/2019 | Clerks record filed |
| |||||
04/29/2019 | Reporters record due | | |||||
04/29/2019 | Record due | | |||||
03/18/2019 | Trial court clerks certification of record requested |
| |||||
03/18/2019 | Case began in court of appeals |
| |||||
02/28/2019 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court | | |||||
02/28/2019 | Sentence imposed in the trial court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
04/22/2020 | Case Stored | Case stored |
04/22/2045 | Retention | Date criminal case will be destroyed (25 years after mandate) |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Allaire, Dustin Michael | Criminal - Appellant | Crespin Michael Linton |
The State of Texas Ex Rel, Travis J. Koehn, Austin County District Attorney | Criminal - State of Texas | Eric Kugler Kim K. Ogg Christopher Conrad |
Trial Court Information
178th District Court
Harris
Honorable Judge, 178th District Court
1584560
Gail Rolen
5 Yrs. TDCJ