judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-7507
A-7507
08/28/1959
Application for Writ of Error
MARYLAND CASUALTY COMPANY
MARION J. SULLIVAN, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS NEXT FRIEND
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
04/21/1960Motion for RehearingPetitioner
12/31/1959Brief on the MeritsRespondent
08/28/1959Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
04/21/1960Motion for RehearingOverruled
04/13/1960Dissenting opinion issued.
04/13/1960Opinion issued
12/31/1959Brief on the Merits
10/28/1959Document received (See Remarks)
10/28/1959Document received (See Remarks)
10/28/1959Document received (See Remarks)
09/14/1959Motion to dismiss
08/28/1959Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
08/28/1959Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Maryland Casualty CompanyPetitioner
Marion J. Sullivan, individually and as Next FriendRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information