judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-7518
A-7518
09/08/1959
Application for Writ of Error
JOHN PLASKY
GULF INSURANCE COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/01/1960Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
01/07/1960Response to Brief filedPetitioner
12/30/1959Supplement to Motion for RehearingRespondent
12/22/1959Supplemental Brief filedPetitioner
10/09/1959Reply to ResponsePetitioner
09/22/1959Response to PetitionRespondent
09/08/1959Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
06/01/1960Amicus Curiae Brief received
05/18/1960Opinion issued
01/07/1960Response to Brief filed
12/30/1959Supplement to Motion for Rehearing
12/22/1959Supplemental Brief filed
10/14/1959Document received (See Remarks)
10/09/1959Reply to Response
09/22/1959Response to Petition
09/08/1959Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
09/08/1959Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
John PlaskyPetitioner
Gulf Insurance CompanyRespondent
Richard F. BurnsAmicus Curiae
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information