judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CHRISTOPHER EDRINGTON v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-07-0171)
Case Number:S-07-0171Case Docketed On:07/27/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Controlled Substances 35-7-1001 - 35-7-1060
Short Title:CHRISTOPHER EDRINGTON v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:CHRISTOPHER EDRINGTON, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantChristopher Donell EdringtonDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
Michael H. Reese
AppelleeThe State of WyomingTerry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Jenny Lynn Craig
Bruce A. Salzburg

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Probation, Probation
Opinion Number:2008 WY 70
Citation:185 P.3d 1264

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
07/27/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
07/27/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
07/27/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
08/31/2007Motion - Withdrawal of counsel for appellantMotionWithdrawal of counselFinal
08/31/2007Order - Granting withdrawal of counselOrderGranting withdrawal of counselFinal
08/31/2007Notice-Incoming - Entry of appearance for Sylvia Lee Hackl to appear on behalf of appellantNotice-IncomingEntry of appearanceFinal
09/10/2007Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
09/18/2007Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
10/29/2007Brief - Appellant; received copy of brief on disk; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.BriefAppellantFinal
11/28/2007Brief - Appellee; received copy of brief on disk; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.BriefAppelleeFinal
12/05/2007Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
12/17/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
12/19/2007Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
12/21/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal, two volumes. Volume I, original papers; Volume II, transcripts.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
03/12/2008Motion - Withdrawal of counsel for Sylvia Lee HacklMotionWithdrawal of counselFinal
03/13/2008Notice-Incoming - Entry of appearance for Michael Henry Reese to appear on behalf of appellantNotice-IncomingEntry of appearanceFinal
03/13/2008Order - Other -order granting motion to withdrawOrderOtherFinal
06/20/2008Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Chief Justice Voigt writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
07/08/2008Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
07/08/2008Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
07/08/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
07/08/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
07/11/2008Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 7/10/08 by Amanda Bellenhar.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal