judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

BRIAN A. BOYD V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CO-1035
Short Caption:BRIAN A. BOYD V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Other - Sentencing Issues only
Lead: 09-CO-0786 Consolidated:10-CO-1035
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:FEL9137-98Filed Date:08/16/2010

Opening Event Date:08/16/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:09/21/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:04/06/2011
Argued/Submitted:10/14/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/01/2011

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantBrian A. Boyd N
Warren GormanNN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
08/16/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
09/09/2010ORDER, SUA SPONTE, CONSOLIDATING APPEALS nos. 09-CO-786 and 10-CO-1035 for all purposes herein. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Warren Gorman, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in appeal no. 10-CO-1035. It is FURTHER ORDERED that a consolidated briefing order will be issued upon the filing in this court, by the Clerk of the SUperior Court, of the record index and record copies in accordance with D.C. App. R. 11 (b)(3)(A) in appeal no. 10-CO-1035. (dfe)
09/21/2010RECORD INDEX (10CO1035)
09/21/2010RECORD COPIES (10CO1035)
09/21/2010RECORD COMPLETED
09/23/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
10/21/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF (no specified time frame)(no oppo).
11/04/2010 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed within 30 days from the date of this order. (By: JAC)
12/01/2010APPELLANT'S BRIEF
12/01/2010APPENDIX
12/13/2010APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF for 60 days (no oppo).
12/27/2010 On consideration of appellee's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellee's brief shall be filed on or before February 28, 2011. (By: JAC)
02/23/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF until April 6, 2011 (no oppo)
03/03/2011 On consideration of appellee's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellee's brief shall be filed on or before April 6, 2011. Any further requests for extensions of time will be looked upon with disfavor and granted only upon a showing of good cause. (By: JAC)
04/06/2011APPELLEE'S BRIEF w/appdx
04/06/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
04/14/2011APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF
04/14/2011APPELLANT'S MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION to supplement appendix
04/14/2011RECEIVED - aplt's supplemental appdx
04/20/2011FiledFinal Screening - Regular
05/05/2011ORDER DENYING APLT MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION without prejudice to refiling with only those documents that were made part of the record in the trial court. (By: ETW)
06/21/2011 It appearing that this appeal is likely to be calendared for argument during the month(s) of Sept 2011 through Nov 2011, it is ORDERED that counsel shall advise this court in writing by July 15, 2011, of specific dates du ring that period when they are unavailable so that the court can attempt to avoid such dates in scheduling argument. (Please see the attached instruction sheet.) (aj) Julio Castillo Clerk
06/30/2011LETTER FROM COUNSEL/PARTY RE FUTURE CALENDARING aplt
09/01/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
10/14/2011FiledArgued before Judges Washington, Reid, Farrell Warren Gorman, Esq. appellant Suzanne C. Nyland, Esq. appellee
11/09/2011FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Washington, Chief Judge, Reid, Associate Judge, Retired, and Farrell, Senior Judge.)
12/01/2011FiledMandate