judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JOSEPH (CHRISTOPHER) VS. STATE C/W 34593

Case Information: 34825
Short Caption:JOSEPH (CHRISTOPHER) VS. STATE C/W 34593Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated: 34593 *, 34825Related Case(s): 34593 , 36649 , 42984
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR962788Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/14/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/14/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 99-08678
09/28/1999MotionFiled Response to Motion. Response to Motion to Consolidate Appeals (nos. 34593 & 34825). 99-09284
10/25/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Consolidation. On September 13, 1999, counsel for appellant filed a motion to consolidate these appeals for purposes of briefing and disposition. On September 28, 1999, the state filed its response to the motion. The motion is granted, and these appeals are consolidated. Nos. 34593, 34825. 99-10438
11/04/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall file, forthwith, the fast track response provisionally submitted on September 28, 1999. Nos. 34593, 34825. 99-10822
11/04/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. Nos. 34593, 34825.
03/09/2000MotionReceived Proper Person Motion. Motion to File Supplemental Pro Se Briefs on Appeal NRAP Rule 46. (Nos. 34593 and 34825).
03/30/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. This court consolidated the appeals on October 25, 1999. "ORDER these appeals dismissed." SNP99B-WM/MS/NB Nos. 34593, 34825. 01-05005
04/25/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (Nos. 34593 and 34825) 00-06626
04/25/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
04/26/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Although appellant has not been granted leave to proceed in proper person, we have received and considered appellant's proper person documents. We deny appellant's request for leave to submit his proper person supplemental brief. Nos 34593 & 34825. Document No. 00-06818
05/25/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 27, 2000. 00-06626