judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-7520
A-7520
09/09/1959
Application for Writ of Error
W. H. FOSTER
CURTIS HICKEY, RAILROAD COMMISSION OF TEXAS
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
11/27/1959Response to Brief filedRespondent
11/19/1959Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
10/29/1959Motion for RehearingPetitioner
09/24/1959Response to PetitionRespondent
09/21/1959Response to PetitionRespondent
09/09/1959Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
11/27/1959Response to Brief filed
11/24/1959Response to Motion filed
11/19/1959Brief in Support of Petition
10/29/1959Motion for RehearingOverruled
09/24/1959Response to Petition
09/21/1959Response to Petition
09/09/1959Application for Writ of Error - Filed
09/09/1959Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Curtis HickeyRespondent
W. H. FosterPetitioner
Railroad Commission of TexasRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information