judyrecords
search tips
750 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Larry Dunn, Jr. v. The State of Texas

Case: 05-13-01712-CR
05-13-01712-CR
12/18/2013
Murder
Larry Dunn, Jr.
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event Type Description Document
10/15/2014Brief filed - oral argument requestedState
10/14/2014Brief received - oral argument requestedState
09/03/2014Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
Date Event Type Disposition Document
08/28/2015Mandate issued
06/18/2015Memorandum opinion issuedReformed and Affirmed
06/18/2015Retention time case file will be retainedRetain
02/10/2015Submitted
01/26/2015Order enteredOtherwise Disposed
01/26/2015Case reinstated
01/23/2015Electronic Supplemental Clerks Record Filed
01/13/2015Order issuedAbated
01/09/2015Motion to withdraw attorney filed
01/06/2015Set for submission on oral argument
10/15/2014Brief filed - oral argument requested
10/15/2014Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/15/2014Case ready to be set
10/14/2014Brief received - oral argument requested
10/14/2014Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
10/03/2014State brief due
09/03/2014Brief filed - oral argument requested
09/03/2014Appellants brief due
08/04/2014Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/04/2014Appellants brief due
08/01/2014Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
07/07/2014Exhibits filed
07/05/2014Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed
06/30/2014Reporters record due
06/02/2014Order enteredOtherwise Disposed
06/02/2014Case reinstated
05/29/2014Electronic Supplemental Clerks Record Filed
04/22/2014Order issuedAbated
03/17/2014Electronic Clerks Record Filed
03/14/2014No clerks record filed in criminal case
03/14/2014No reporters record filed in criminal case
03/05/2014Record due
12/23/2013Docketing statement filed
12/18/2013Docketing statement due
12/18/2013Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals
11/05/2013Judgment signed by trial court judge
11/05/2013Motion for new trial was filed in the trial court
11/05/2013Notice of appeal filed in trial court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/23/2020Case StoredPermanent retention required in criminal case
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Dunn, Junior, LarryCriminal - AppellantRonald L. Goranson  
THE STATE OF TEXASCriminal - State of TexasSusan Hawk
Karen R. Wise
Trial Court Information
194th Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Ernest White
F-1259904-M
Belinda Baraka