judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-7472
A-7472
08/07/1959
Application for Writ of Error
R.M. WELL SERVICING AND DRILLING COMPANY
DALE TRUCK LINE, INC., WORLD FIRE AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
11/12/1959Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
10/04/1959Motion for RehearingPetitioner
10/01/1959Supplemental Brief filedPetitioner
09/05/1959Response to PetitionRespondent
08/28/1959Response to PetitionRespondent
08/07/1959Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
11/12/1959Brief in Support of Petition
10/04/1959Motion for RehearingOverruled
10/01/1959Supplemental Brief filed
09/05/1959Response to Petition
08/28/1959Response to Petition
08/19/1959Motion for Extension of Time to File Response
08/07/1959Application for Writ of Error - FiledOverruled
08/07/1959Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
World Fire and Marine Insurance CompanyRespondent
Dale Truck Line, Inc.Respondent
R.M. Well Servicing and Drilling CompanyPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information