judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

IN RE: DISCIPLINE OF LEE E. WALKER

Case Information: 38152
Short Caption:IN RE: DISCIPLINE OF LEE E. WALKERCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):NONEClassification:Bar Matter - Discipline - Petition
Disqualifications:YoungCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/10/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
07/10/2001Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record of Bar Proceedings. Vols. 1 through 4. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 01-11564
12/06/2001Order/Dispositional BarFiled Bar Discipline Order. We conclude that clear and convincing evidence supports the violations found by the panel. We further conclude that the recommended discipline is appropriate in light of the mitigating circumstances demonstrated by the record. "We suspend Walker for a period of thirty-six months, to run from the dte of his temporary suspension." fn3[Under SCR 115(3), the temporary suspension was effective fifteen days after the date of our order, or April 9, 1999. Walker's suspension will terminate on April 9, 2002.] In addition, Walker must pay the costs of thedisciplinary proceeding. At any future reinstatement hearing, Walker must present evidence concerning the status of his criminal appeal. fn1[This is our final disposition of this matter. Any new proceedings concerning Walker shall be docketed under a new docket number. The Honorable Cliff Young, Justice, voluntarily recused himself from participation in the decision of this matter.] EN BANC 01-20491
12/31/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Certificate of Service by Mail and Notice of Order to Public. 01-21949
01/02/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-20779
01/02/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
02/06/2002RemittiturIssued Return Letter. Returned Record on Appeal, Vols. 1 through 4 this day. 01-20779
05/09/2003RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 5, 2003. 01-20779