judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ROGER SWINNEY, CAROL SWINNEY, RA SWINNEY LLP, A COLORADO ENTITY, and CE SWINNEY, LLC, A WYOMING ENTITY v. JAMES E. JONES, III, LYNNE A. LOVELACE, LAUREL MILLER LUNSTRUM, CATHLEEN A. JONES, HILLTOP NATIONAL BANK as TRUSTEE, R.M. WHALEN MD, PC PSP TRUST, AURLA J. WELO, ANTHONY G. INGRAM and ROBERT P. INGRAM

Case Heading (S-07-0176)
Case Number:S-07-0176Case Docketed On:08/06/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:Seventh Judicial District Natrona CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Property, Conveyances and Security Transactions (Title 34)
Short Title:ROGER SWINNEY, CAROL SWINNEY, RA SWINNEY LLP, A COLORADO ENTITY, and CE SWINNEY, LLC, A WYOMING ENTITY v. JAMES E. JONES, III, LYNNE A. LOVELACE, LAUREL MILLER LUNSTRUM, CATHLEEN A. JONES, HILLTOP NATIONAL BANK as TRUSTEE, R.M. WHALEN MD, PC PSP TRUST, AURLA J. WELO, ANTHONY G. INGRAM and ROBERT P. INGRAM
Full Title:ROGER SWINNEY, CAROL SWINNEY, RA SWINNEY LLP, A COLORADO ENTITY, and CE SWINNEY, LLC, A WYOMING ENTITY, Appellants (Plaintiffs), v. JAMES E. JONES, III, LYNNE A. LOVELACE, LAUREL MILLER LUNSTRUM, CATHLEEN A. JONES, HILLTOP NATIONAL BANK as TRUSTEE, R.M. WHALEN MD, PC PSP TRUST, AURLA J. WELO, ANTHONY G. INGRAM and ROBERT P. INGRAM, Appellees (Defendants).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantRoger SwinneyJohn H. Robinson
AppellantCarol SwinneyJohn H. Robinson
AppellantRA Swinney LLLP, a Colorado EntityJohn H. Robinson
AppellantCE Swinney LLC, a Wyoming EntityJohn H. Robinson
AppelleeRobert P. IngramDouglas R. McLaughlin
Mary Bell Guthrie
AppelleeAnthony G. IngramDouglas R. McLaughlin
Mary Bell Guthrie
AppelleeJames E. Jones IIIKendal Royce Hoopes
Peter C. Nicolaysen
AppelleeLynn E. LovelaceKendal Royce Hoopes
Peter C. Nicolaysen
AppelleeLaurel Miller LunstrumKendal Royce Hoopes
Peter C. Nicolaysen
AppelleeCathleen A. JonesKendal Royce Hoopes
Peter C. Nicolaysen
AppelleeAurla J. WeloKendal Royce Hoopes
Peter C. Nicolaysen
AppelleeHilltop National Bank, Trustee of the R.M. Whalen, MD, PCP Profit Sharing Plan TrustStuart R. Day

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Contracts, Other
Opinion Number:2008 WY 150
Citation:199 P.3d 512

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
08/06/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
08/06/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
08/06/2007Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
08/06/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
08/17/2007Motion - Withdrawal of counsel, William D. BagleyMotionWithdrawal of counselFinal
08/17/2007Motion - Other - Substitution of Counsel for AppellantsMotionOtherFinal
08/17/2007Notice-Incoming - Entry of appearance by Richard R. Jamieson to appear on behalf of appellantsNotice-IncomingEntry of appearanceFinal
08/17/2007Order - Other - allowing withdrawal of counselOrderOtherFinal
09/18/2007Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantsMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
09/18/2007Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
10/29/2007Notice-Incoming - Entry of appearance - John H. Robinson for appellants.Notice-IncomingEntry of appearanceFinal
10/29/2007Brief - Appellants; and received copy of designation of record.BriefAppellantFinal
12/10/2007Brief - Appellees James E. Jones, III, Lynne A. Lovelace, Laurel Miller Lunstrum, Cathleen A. Jones, and Aurla J. Welo; and received copy of brief on disk.BriefAppelleeFinal
12/11/2007Notice-Incoming - Entry of appearance for Mary B. Guthrie to appear on behalf of appellees IngramNotice-IncomingEntry of appearanceFinal
12/11/2007Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
12/14/2007Brief - Joinder from appellee Hilltop National BankBriefJoinderFinal
12/26/2007Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
12/27/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
01/02/2008Record - Transmitted record on appeal from District Court Clerk, two volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, TranscriptRecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
01/17/2008Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
01/25/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - John Robinson for appellants.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
01/28/2008Motion - Oral argument - vacate - Appellees James E. Jones, III, Lynne A. Lovelace, Laurel Miller Lunstrum, Cathleen A. Jones, and Aurla J. Welo's motion to vacate and reset oral argument.MotionOral argument - vacateFinal
01/28/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Kendal R. Hoopes for appellees.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
01/29/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Stuart R. Day for appellee Hilltop National Bank.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
01/29/2008Order - Vacating setting for oral argumentOrderVacating setting for oral argumentFinal
02/25/2008Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
02/27/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Stuard R. Day for appellees.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
02/27/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - John H. Robinson for appellants.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
04/01/2008Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before Chief Justice Voigt, Justices Golden, Hill and Burke (John H. Robinson for appellants; Stuart R. Day and Peter C. Nicolaysen, argument by Mr. Day for all appellees) and takenunder advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
04/01/2008Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
12/17/2008Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Burke writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
01/05/2009Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
01/05/2009Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
01/05/2009Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
01/05/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
01/07/2009Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 1/6/09.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal