judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

RUDI H. GRESHAM V. SMITHWICK AND BELENDIUK, P.C.

Case Information: 10-CV-1043
Short Caption:RUDI H. GRESHAM V. SMITHWICK AND BELENDIUK, P.C.Classification:Appeals - Civil - Contracts
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAB9492-95Filed Date:08/05/2010

Opening Event Date:08/05/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:09/23/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:12/29/2010
Argued/Submitted:05/10/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:08/26/2011

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantRudi H. Gresham N
Robert BunnYY
AppelleeSmithwich & Belediunk P.C.N
George W. Krywolap YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
08/05/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
09/17/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on August 12, 2010, and it appearing that no transcript is needed for this appeal, it is ORDERED that a briefing order will be issued upon the filing in this court, by the Clerk of the Superior Court, of the record index in accordance with D.C. App. R. 11 (b)(3)(A). (JAC) elp
09/23/2010RECORD INDEX
09/23/2010RECORD COMPLETED
09/27/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (a)(1), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC) elp
11/01/2010APPELLANT'S BRIEF w/appendix attached
11/01/2010APPENDIX
11/10/2010APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE
11/15/2010TMC - motion for summary affirmance - oppo - appellant's brief
11/17/2010APPELLANT'S OPPOSITION - to aple's motion for summary affirmance
11/30/2010 ORDERED that APPELLEE'S MOTINO FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE IS DENIED. It is FURTHER ORDERED that APPELLEE shall W/N 30 DAYS from the date of this order, file its brief. (RDBRNW) (rm)
11/30/2010FINAL SCREENING - SUMMARY CALENDAR I****TMC
12/29/2010APPELLEE'S BRIEF
12/29/2010APPENDIX
12/29/2010BRIEFS COMPLETED
01/24/2011APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF w/ appendix
02/17/2011FINAL SCREENING - SUMMARY CALENDAR I
04/05/2011CALENDAR NOTICE SENT
05/10/2011FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
05/10/2011SUBMITTED to Ruiz,Oberly,Farrell.
08/04/2011FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Ruiz, Oberly, Farrell)
08/26/2011FiledMandate