Case: 14-0844
14-0844
10/14/2014
Petition for Review originally filed as 53.7(f)
PHYLLIS REESE AND ALL OCCUPANTS OF 2404 RAINTREE DRIVE, PLANO, TEXAS 75074
BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. ITS SUCCESSORS AND ASSIGNS
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
10/29/2014 | Petition for Review | Petitioner | Petition for Review filed on behalf of Phyllis Reese, et al. |
|
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
03/12/2015 | Notice sent to Court of Appeals | |
| |||||
01/30/2015 | Petition for Review disposed | Dismissed for Want of Jurisdiction | See TEX. GOV’T CODE § 22.225(b)(1). |
| ||||
12/02/2014 | Case forwarded to Court | | | |||||
11/25/2014 | Response Waiver filed | Response Waiver filed on behalf of Bank of America, N.A. | ||||||
11/04/2014 | Designation of Lead Counsel | Notice of Appeanrance as Lead Counsel - Mark D. Cronenwett and Dustin George filed on behalf of Bank of America. | ||||||
10/29/2014 | Petition for Review | Petition for Review filed on behalf of Phyllis Reese, et al. |
| |||||
10/29/2014 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposed | Filing granted | Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review is Granted. Petition for Review is due October 29, 2014. |
| ||||
10/15/2014 | Phone call from Clerk's Office | Spoke with Ms. Stevens and she will review the motion and confer with her client regarding filing a written response in opposition. She will call back no later than October 17, 2014. | | |||||
10/14/2014 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed | Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review filed on behalf of Phyllis Reese. |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
03/12/2015 | Case Stored | Case stored. | e-stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Bank of America, N.A. | Respondent | Mary M. Speidel Dustin C. George Mr. Mark D. Cronenwett Diana E. Stevens |
Reese, Phyllis | Petitioner | Nadine R. King-Mays |
Court of Appeals Information:
05-13-00560-CV
Affirmed
___ SW3d ___, 08-15-14
5th Court of Appeals
Honorable David B. Lewis
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No 2
Collin
Honorable Barnett Walker
002-00480-201