judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

LUECK VS. DISTRICT COURT

Case Information: 38151
Short Caption:LUECK VS. DISTRICT COURTCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 38510
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D260292Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus
Disqualifications:LeavittCase Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:02/07/2002How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/10/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
07/10/2001Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Mandamus. 01-11561
07/10/2001Filing Fee Returned Filing Fee. Check No.17344 in the amount of $200 returned to Howard & Mastin Ltd. No filing fee due.
07/10/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Procedural Deficiency. Proof of service on the respondent district judge. Due Date: 10 days
07/19/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. (Petition for Writ of Mandamus - Judge Mark Gibbons). 01-12278
07/24/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Answer Writ Petition. The real party in interest Lina Elbrader, on behalf of respondents, shall have 30 days from the date of this order within which to file an answer, including authorities, against issuance of the requested writ. 01-12565
08/22/2001BriefFiled Amicus Brief. Amicus Brief of the Nevada Commission on Judicial Discipline. 01-14243
08/24/2001MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. 01-14390
08/28/2001Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. filed August 24, 2001. Real party in interest Lina Elbrader shall have to and including September 6, 2001, to file and serve her answer. 01-14517
09/07/2001MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. 01-15149
09/11/2001Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. filed September 7, 2001. Real party in interest Lina Elbrader shall have until September 20, 2001, to file and serve her answer. 01-15302
09/21/2001Petition/WritFiled Answer to Petition for Writ. 01-15949
09/21/2001AppendixFiled Appendix. Appendix of Real Party in Interest Lina Elbrader. 01-15951
09/24/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. (Answer to Petition and Appendix). 01-16095
09/24/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. --Receipt of Copy of Answer to Petition and Appendix. 01-16107
09/27/2001OtherDisqualification of Justice Leavitt. Son represents a party in the action out of which the petition arose.
10/04/2001MotionFiled Motion for Permission to File Document. (Reply to Answer to Petition). 01-16694
10/09/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. for permission to file a reply brief in response to the amicus curiae brief filed by the Nevada Commission on Judicial Discipline on August 22, 2001. Petitioner shall have 10 days from the date of this order to file a reply brief. 01-16994
10/18/2001Other Other. Filed Reply Brief in Opposition to Amicus Curiae Brief of the Nevada Commission on Judicial Discipline. 01-17617
12/21/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 60 minutes in Carson City on February 11, 2002, at 9:00 a.m. (En Banc)
01/07/2002Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. from attorney John Eccles stating that he no longer represents real party in interest Michael Elbrader in this matter. 02-00391
01/14/2002Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance. Daniel Marks files his general appearance for real party in interest Micheal Elbrader. 02-00923
01/23/2002Other Other. Filed Real Party in Interest Michael Elbrader's Authorities. 02-01504
01/28/2002Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.
01/31/2002MotionFiled Motion. Motion for Leave of Court to Supplement the Answer to the Petition for Writ of Mandamus. 02-02066
01/31/2002Other Other. Received Supplement to Answer to the Petition for Writ of Mandamus. 02-02069
01/31/2002Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. --Certificate of Mailing. Motion and supplement mailed to Alan Rabkin, Nevada Commission on Judicial Discipline. 02-02071
02/07/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Order Vacating Oral Argument and Submitting for Decision Without Oral Argument. Having further reviewed the record in this matter, we have determined that oral argument would not be of assistance in the disposition of this matter. The oral argument scheduled for February 11, 2002, is vacated and this matter shall stand submitted for decision to the en banc court as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. 02-02468
02/07/2002Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
02/08/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Motion Granted in Part. The clerk of this court shall file the "Supplement to Answer to the Petition for Writ of Mandamus" received on January 31, 2002. The court will disregard those portions of the supplement which discuss unrelated proceedings. Accordingly, the clerk of this court shall strike from the supplement: (1) the portion that begins on page 2, line 13, and ends at page 5, line 6; and (2) Exhibit 2, entitled "Order Striking Notice of Appearance of Counsel." 02-02533
02/08/2002Petition/WritFiled Answer to Petition for Writ. Supplement to Answer to the Petition for Writ of Mandamus. (Stricken per order: (1) the portion that begins on page 2, line 13, and ends at page 5, line 6; and (2) Exhibit 2, entitled "Order Striking Notice of Appearance of Counsel.") 02-02069
04/02/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition. Judgment: "ORDER the petition DENIED." Fn2 [The Honorable Myron Leavitt, Justice, voluntarily recused himself from participation in the decision of this matter.] En Banc - Full Court. 02-05889
04/30/2002RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. 02-05959
04/30/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.