judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JAMES EDWARD SCHAFER v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-07-0175)
Case Number:S-07-0175Case Docketed On:08/03/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:Seventh Judicial District Natrona CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Controlled Substances 35-7-1001 - 35-7-1060
Short Title:JAMES EDWARD SCHAFER v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:JAMES EDWARD SCHAFER, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantJames Edward SchaferDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
Kirk Allan Morgan
David E. Westling
AppelleeThe State of WyomingTerry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Bruce A. Salzburg
Graham Macdonald Smith

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Crimes, Criminal Law -Prosecutorial Misconduct
Opinion Number:2008 WY 149
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
08/03/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
08/03/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
08/03/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
08/08/2007Record - Court Reporter's certificate of completionRecordCourt Reporter's certificate of completionFinal
09/20/2007Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
09/20/2007Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
11/05/2007Brief - Appellant; received copy of brief on disk; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.BriefAppellantFinal
12/11/2007Brief - Appellee; received copy of brief on disk and designation of record on appealBriefAppelleeFinal
12/31/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
01/04/2008Record - Transmitted record on appeal from District Court Court, eight volumes total. CR 16873 Volumes I & II, Original Papers; Volume III, Transcripts; Volume IV, Confidential Information; Volume V, Exhibits; CR 17017 Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcripts; Volume III, Confidential InformationRecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
01/17/2008Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
01/25/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Kirk Morgan and David Westling for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
01/25/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Graham Smith for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
03/04/2008Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Kirk Allan Morgan, Assistant Appellate Counsel and David E. Westling, Senior Assistant Public Defender for appellant; Graham Macdonald Smith, Assistant Attorney General for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
03/04/2008Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
12/17/2008Opinion - Opinion and journal order reversing and remanding, Justice Hill writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
12/22/2008Service - Certified mail signature return card. Certified opinion sent to Warden at WSP signed for 12/18/08.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal
01/05/2009Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
01/05/2009Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
01/05/2009Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
01/05/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal