judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

WAVERLY E. BENSON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CF-1042
Short Caption:WAVERLY E. BENSON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Weapons Related
Lead:10-CF-1042Consolidated: 10-CF-1300
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF2-27980-08Filed Date:08/20/2010

Opening Event Date:08/20/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:10/19/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:03/14/2011
Argued/Submitted:09/20/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/28/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantWaverly E. Benson YPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Andrea L. Hertzfeld YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
08/20/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
09/03/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Judith A. Lovelace, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. For the Court, Julio A. Castillo, Clerk.
09/07/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed (pii)
10/19/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (501 pgs/Shelton) 7/19-22/10 proc.
10/19/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (11 pgs/tape) 7/28/10 proc. w/cd
10/19/2010RECORD COMPLETED
10/21/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
10/26/2010RECORD INDEX
10/26/2010RECORD COPIES
10/26/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (DC pretrial servs re- port)
11/15/2010ORDERED, sua sponte, that appeals nos. 10-CF-1042 and 10-CF-1300 are consolidated for all purposes herein. F/O that Erek Barron, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appelalnt in appeal no. 10-CF-1300. F/O that counsel for appellant in appeal no. 10-CF-1300 shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 60 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. F/O that appellant Benson's brief and the limited appendix remain due to be filed with this court on or before November 30, 2010. (JAC)
11/29/2010APPELLANT'S BRIEF w/appendix attached (BENSON)
11/29/2010APPENDIX (BENSON)
12/10/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (McKinley) (RT ordered/needed (pii))
12/23/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (McKinley) (The SRT just indicates that the ordered RT have been completed (pii)
12/27/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #4 (7 pgs/Tape - 3/4/09 proc.)(w/CD)
12/27/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #5 (8 pgs/Tape - 8/31/09 proc.)
12/29/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed in appeal no. 10-CF-1300 with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant Terrance F. McKinley's brief and limited appendix including documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's consolidated brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
01/03/2011RECORD COPIES (10-CF-1300)
01/03/2011RECORD INDEX (10-CF-1300)
02/07/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF (McKinley)
02/07/2011APPENDIX
03/14/2011APPELLEE'S BRIEF
03/14/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
03/24/2011FiledFinal Screening - Summary
04/01/2011APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF
04/04/2011APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF (Benson)
07/28/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
09/20/2011FiledSubmitted To Washington,Blackburne-Rigsby,Newman
11/04/2011FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Washington, Chief Judge, Blackburne-Rigsby, Associate Judge, and Newman, Senior Judge.)
11/14/2011FiledQualls Letter Filed (Appellant)
11/28/2011FiledMandate
12/07/2011FiledQualls Letter Filed (McKinley) (Appellant)