Case: 04-12-00637-CR
04-12-00637-CR
10/01/2012
Capital Murder
Stephen Jonathon Vogt
The State of Texas
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
09/03/2013 | Brief filed - oral argument requested | State |
| ||
06/03/2013 | Brief filed - oral argument requested | Appellant |
|
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
05/07/2014 | Mandate acknowledged by trial court clerk | | |||||
05/07/2014 | Mandate issued |
| |||||
05/06/2014 | Notice received | | |||||
04/09/2014 | Petition for discretionary review disposed by Court of Criminal Appeals | Refused | | ||||
01/30/2014 | Case forwarded to higher court | | |||||
01/22/2014 | Petition for discretionary review filed in Court of Criminal Appeals | | |||||
12/18/2013 | Opinion issued | Affirmed and Reformed |
| ||||
11/13/2013 | Submitted | | |||||
10/03/2013 | Set for submission on oral argument |
| |||||
09/03/2013 | Brief filed - oral argument requested |
| |||||
09/03/2013 | Case ready to be set | | |||||
08/05/2013 | Order entered |
| |||||
08/05/2013 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Grant motion | | ||||
08/05/2013 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||
07/08/2013 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Grant motion |
| ||||
07/03/2013 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||
06/03/2013 | Brief filed - oral argument requested |
| |||||
04/29/2013 | Order entered |
| |||||
04/29/2013 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion Granted in Part | | ||||
04/25/2013 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||
04/01/2013 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion Granted in Part |
| ||||
04/01/2013 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||
03/08/2013 | Prescreened | | |||||
03/05/2013 | Reporters record filed |
| |||||
01/30/2013 | No reporters record filed in criminal case |
| |||||
01/09/2013 | Clerks record filed |
| |||||
10/01/2012 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals | | |||||
09/28/2012 | Docketing statement filed | | |||||
09/28/2012 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court | | |||||
09/28/2012 | Motion for new trial was filed in the trial court | | |||||
09/21/2012 | Sentence imposed in the trial court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
05/07/2014 | Case Stored | Case stored |
05/07/2014 | Case Stored | Permanent retention required in criminal case |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Vogt, Stephen Jonathon | Criminal - Appellant | Michael C. Gross |
The State of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | Lauren A. Scott |
Trial Court Information
290th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable Melisa C. Skinner
2009CR12648B
Life