Case: 15-0889
15-0889
11/19/2015
Petition for Review originally filed as 53.7(f)
JODY WEIDERMAN
THE CITY OF ARLINGTON, TEXAS AND ROBERT CLUCK, MAYOR
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
03/07/2016 | Motion for Rehearing | Rehearing filed in Petition for Review | Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of Jody Weiderman. |
| ||||
12/30/2015 | Petition for Review | Petitioner | Petition for Review filed on behalf of Jody Weiderman |
|
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
04/08/2016 | Notice sent to Court of Appeals | |
| |||||
04/08/2016 | Motion for Rehearing - Disposed | Denied | |
| ||||
03/08/2016 | Case forwarded to Court | | | |||||
03/07/2016 | Motion for Rehearing | Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of Jody Weiderman. |
| |||||
02/19/2016 | Petition for Review disposed | Denied | |
| ||||
01/19/2016 | Case forwarded to Court | | | |||||
01/12/2016 | Response Waiver filed | Response Waiver filed on behalf of City of Arlington, Texas, et al. | ||||||
12/30/2015 | Petition for Review | Petition for Review filed on behalf of Jody Weiderman |
| |||||
11/24/2015 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposed | Filing granted | Petition for Review is due December 30, 2015. |
| ||||
11/19/2015 | Response to Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review | Response in Opposition to Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review filed on behalf of The City of Arlington, et al. | ||||||
11/19/2015 | Call received | received call from respondent's counsel office to inform the Court that they are going to be filing an opposition to the motion today. | | |||||
11/19/2015 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed | Opposed Motion to Extend Time to File Petition for Review. On behalf of Jody Weiderman. |
|
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
04/08/2016 | Case Stored | Case stored. | e-stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
City of Arlington | Respondent | Mr. Robert H. Fugate |
Cluck, Mayor Robert | Respondent | Mr. Robert H. Fugate |
Weiderman, Jody | Petitioner | Mr. William A. 'Andy' Taylor Mr. Wallace B. Jefferson |
Court of Appeals Information:
02-15-00120-CV
Affirmed
480 SW3d 32, 09-17-15
2nd Court of Appeals
Honorable E. Lee Gabriel
Trial Court Information
236th District Court
Tarrant
Honorable Thomas Wilson Lowe
236-277052-15