judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

HART(STEPHEN) VS. STATE

Case Information: 32651
Short Caption:HART(STEPHEN) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 37376 , 39264 , 43314 , 44776
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C144612Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:11/09/1999 at 8:30 AMOral Argument Location:Las Vegas Office
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/06/1998Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
07/06/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)
07/16/1998Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Court Reporter: Rober Mintun.
07/16/1998Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement.
08/17/1998TranscriptFiled Transcript. Certified Copy of Transcript of Proceedings: 8/21/97; 1/15/98; 8/14/97; 2/2/98; 4/9/98; 4/15/98; and 4/16/98. Court Reporter: Robert H. Mintun.
10/26/1998BriefFiled Brief. Appellant's Opening Brief. (Mailed on: 10/21/98).
10/26/1998AppendixFiled Appendix. Appellant's Appendix.
11/23/1998MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Respondent may have to and including December 23, 1998, within which to file the answering brief.
12/28/1998BriefFiled Brief. Respondent's Answering Brief. (Mailed on: express mail-no postmark).
01/25/1999BriefFiled Brief. Appellant's Reply Brief. (Mailed on: No postmark).
03/04/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. Oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted as of the date of this order, on the record and briefs filed herein.
03/04/1999Other Other. Case Submitted on the record and briefs this day.
09/15/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. March 4, 1999, we entered an order submitting this matter, without oral argument, on the record and briefs filed herein. We have determined that oral argument might be helpful in the resolution of this appeal. We direct the clerk of this court to schedule this matter for oral argument on November 9, 1999, at 1:30 p.m. in Las Vegas before the Southern Nevada Panel: 30 minutes. SNP99B-WM/MS/NB
10/15/1999Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice. Oral Argument is rescheduled for November 9, 1999 at the hour of 8:30 a.m. - 1/2 hr. in Las Vegas. (SNP-WM, MS, NB)
10/25/1999Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice. Reminder Notice for Oral Argument.
11/09/1999Other Other. Oral Argument before the Sourthern Nevada Panel: submitted. SNP99B-WM/MS/NB
03/02/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." SNP99B-WM/MS/NB 00-03312
03/28/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-04934
03/28/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
04/26/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 3, 2000. 00-04934