judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

LEE VS. STATE

Case Information: 33081
Short Caption:LEE VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Pershing Co. - Eleventh Judicial District - 968205Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:12/14/1999 at 11:00 AMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:12/14/1999How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/28/1998Other Other. Returned filing fee of $200 to Lamond R. Mills-check no. 6605 (filing fee not required in criminal cases).
09/28/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast track notice mailed to all counsel).
10/06/1998Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice. Mailed corrected receipt to all counsel and district court clerk (not a Clark County case- fast track notice mailed to all counsel).
10/16/1998Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. Appellant's Fast Track Statement.
10/16/1998AppendixFiled Appendix. Appellant's Appendix.
10/20/1998TranscriptFiled Transcript. Certified copy of Transcript of Proceedings. Arraignment--3/11/97; Telephonic Motion to Dismiss--9/23/97; Sentencing--9/8/98. Court Reporter: Barbara J. Johnson.
11/06/1998Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Filed Certified Copy of Amended Judgment of Conviction filed in district court on November 3, 1998.
11/09/1998Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response.
05/18/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. We have determined that full briefing will assist the court in the disposition of this appeal. The appellant shall file and serve the opening brief and appendix within 40 days after the date of this order. fn3[ We hereby suspend the requirement in NRAP 9 for counsel to file a certified transcript in this appeal]. The answering brief and reply brief shall be filed in compliance with NRAP 31.
06/28/1999BriefFiled Brief. Appellant's Opening Brief. (Mailed on: Fed-Ex 6/26/99).
06/28/1999AppendixFiled Appendix. Appellant's Appendix.
07/12/1999BriefFiled Brief. Respondent's Answering Brief (mailed on: 7/9/99).
07/23/1999BriefFiled Brief. Appellant's Reply Brief. (Mailed on: 7/20/99).
10/22/1999Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice. Oral Argument is scheduled for Tuesday, December 14, 1999 at the hour of 11:00 a.m. - 1/2 hour in Carson City, (NNP- CY/DA/ML).
11/29/1999Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice. Oral Argument Reminder Notice.
12/14/1999Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. Oral Argument before the Northern Nevada Panel: submitted. NNP99B-CY/DA/ML
04/06/2000Opinion/DispositionalFiled Per Curiam Opinion. "Remanded with instructions." Before Young, Agosti and Leavitt, JJ. Per Curiam. 116 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 51. NNP99B-CY/DA/ML 00-05535
05/02/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-07134
05/02/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
06/07/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 3, 2000. 00-07134