judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DOUGLAS N. NELSON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CF-1227
Short Caption:DOUGLAS N. NELSON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Lead:10-CF-1227Consolidated: 10-CF-1228
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF2-25141-08Filed Date:09/29/2010

Opening Event Date:09/29/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:03/28/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:03/20/2012
Argued/Submitted:09/27/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/27/2012

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Sharon A. SpragueYY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
09/29/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
10/19/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeals and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED, sua sponte, that appeals nos. 10-CF-1227 and 10-CF-1228 are consolidated for all purposes herein. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Matthew Leefer, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in these appeals. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court records and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to these appeals have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
10/19/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Matthew Leefer, Esquire
11/15/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed (pii)) 10-CF-1227
11/15/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed (pii)) 10-CF-1228
03/18/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (56 pgs/Swaringer) 8/12/10 proc.
03/18/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (109 pgs/Hill) 8/16/10 proc.
03/18/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (101 pgs/Hill) 8/17/10 proc.
03/18/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (17 pgs/tape) 9/22/10 proc. w/cd
03/18/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #5 (8 pgs/tape) 11/18/08 proc.
03/18/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #6 (17 pgs/tape) 2/6/09 proc.
03/18/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #7 (10 pgs/tape) 3/6/09 proc.
03/18/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #8 (5 pgs/tape) 8/11/09 proc.
03/18/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #9 (9 pgs/tape) 10/2/09 proc.
03/18/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #10 (35 pgs/tape) 1/25/10 proc.
03/18/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #11 (68 pgs/Ransom-Jones) 1/26/10 proc.
03/18/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #12 (54 pgs/Pirfo) 1/26/10 proc. p.m.
03/18/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #13 (272 pgs/Hamilton) 1/27/10 proc.
03/18/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #14 (186 pgs/Ramsom-Jones) 1/28/10 proc.
03/18/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #15 (4 pgs/tape) 2/5/10 proc.
03/18/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #16 (7 pgs/tape) 2/17/10 proc.
03/18/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #17 (19 pgs/tape) 2/19/10 proc. w/cd
03/24/2011RECORD INDEX (10-CF-1228)
03/24/2011RECORD COPIES
03/24/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #18 (SEALED pleadings)
03/25/2011RECORD INDEX (10-CF-1227)
03/25/2011RECORD COPIES
03/28/2011FiledSUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #19 (SEALED PLEADING)
03/28/2011RECORD COMPLETED
03/31/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
05/11/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF until August 8, 2011 (no oppo)
05/16/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before August 8, 2011. (JAC)
08/10/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief for 75 days (no oppo). (Appellant)
08/17/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's motion for extension to 10/24/11.
10/24/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)
11/03/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's motion for extension to file brief and limited appendix to 12/3/11.
12/05/2011FiledBrief (Appellant)
12/05/2011FiledAppendix (Appellant)
01/04/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee)
01/09/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Appellee's motion for an extension of time to 2/21/12.
02/21/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief until March 22, 2012 (Appellee)Granted
03/02/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief until March 22, 2012 (Appellee)
03/20/2012FiledBrief (Appellee)
03/20/2012FiledBriefing Completed
03/29/2012FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Summary
07/26/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
09/27/2012FiledSubmitted to Judges Washington, Glickman, Pryor
11/01/2012FiledAffirmed In Part/Reversed In Part/Remanded In Part (OPINION) (Washington, Chief Judge, Glickman, Associate Judge, and Pryor, Senior Judge)
11/27/2012FiledMandate
12/03/2012FiledQualls Letter Filed (Appellant)