judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

NOVELLY VS. NOVELLY

Case Information: 32942
Short Caption:NOVELLY VS. NOVELLYCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Nye Co. - Fifth Judicial District - CV11687Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:05/05/1999How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/01/1998Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from George R. Carter-check no. 4182.
09/01/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day (docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant).
09/01/1998Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Certificate of Attorney Regarding Transcript. (No transcripts requested.) Filed in district court on 8/21/98.
09/21/1998Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement.
01/07/1999MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: January 11, 1999.
01/07/1999BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: 1/5/99.
01/07/1999AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief.
05/05/1999Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
05/09/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." NNP99B-CY/DA/ML 00-07576
06/06/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-09500
06/06/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
06/21/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 9, 2000. 00-09500