judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JOSE LOREDO and YOLAND LOREDO, and ALEXANDER LOREDO, a minor, by and through his next friend, YOLANDA LOREDO v. JOY TECHNOLOGIES, INC., a Delaware corporation

Case Heading (S-08-0032)
Case Number:S-08-0032Case Docketed On:02/11/2008
Linked To: S-08-0030 , S-08-0031
Status:Closed
Original Court:Third Judicial District Sweetwater CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Common Law - Personal Injury
Short Title:JOSE LOREDO and YOLAND LOREDO, and ALEXANDER LOREDO, a minor, by and through his next friend, YOLANDA LOREDO v. JOY TECHNOLOGIES, INC., a Delaware corporation
Full Title:JOSE LOREDO and YOLAND LOREDO, and ALEXANDER LOREDO, a minor, by and through his next friend, YOLANDA LOREDO, Appellants (Plaintiffs), v. JOY TECHNOLOGIES, INC., a Delaware corporation, Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantJose LoredoPamela Treste Parkins
P. Richard Meyer
Heather Noble
AppellantYolanda LoredoPamela Treste Parkins
P. Richard Meyer
Heather Noble
AppellantAlexander LoredoPamela Treste Parkins
P. Richard Meyer
Heather Noble
AppelleeJoy Technologies, Inc., A Delaware corporationRichard Alan Mincer
Richard Grant Schneebeck
Lindsay Ann Woznick

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Labor and Employment, Products Liability
Opinion Number:2009 WY 93
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
02/11/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
02/11/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
02/11/2008Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
02/11/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
02/28/2008Notice-Incoming - Amended indexNotice-IncomingAmended indexFinal
03/19/2008Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
03/19/2008Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
04/24/2008Brief - Appellants, statement of costs and received copy of designation of recordBriefAppellantFinal
06/09/2008Brief - Appellee Joy Technologies, Inc.; and received copy of brief on cd.BriefAppelleeFinal
06/27/2008Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
07/02/2008Notice-Incoming - Designation of recordNotice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
07/07/2008Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
07/08/2008Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
07/08/2008Notice-Incoming - Entry of appearance for Heather Noble to appear on behalf of appellantsNotice-IncomingEntry of appearanceFinal
07/10/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Richard Mincer for appelleeNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
07/21/2008Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
07/21/2008Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, ten volumes, original papers.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
07/21/2008Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
07/28/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - P. Richard Meyer for appellants.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
08/13/2008Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (P. Richard Meyer for appellant, Joe Myron Teig and Richard Alan Mincer for appellees) and taken under advisementEventOral argument presentedFinal
08/13/2008Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
07/28/2009Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Hill writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
08/13/2009Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
08/13/2009Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
08/13/2009Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
08/13/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
08/17/2009Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 8/14/09.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal