judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MITCHELL FIELDER V. D.C. DEP'T OF HEALTH BOARD OF PHARMACY

Case Information: 10-AA-1196
Short Caption:MITCHELL FIELDER V. D.C. DEP'T OF HEALTH BOARD OF PHARMACYClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Other agency
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:Not SpecifiedFiled Date:09/28/2010

Opening Event Date:09/28/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/22/2013
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerMitchell Fielder YPro SeN
RespondentD.C. Dep't of Health Board of PharmacyN
Todd S. KimNY
Gregory M. CummingNN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
09/28/2010PETITION FOR REVIEW (nunc pro tunc)
09/28/2010PETITIONER'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS
10/14/2010ORDER GRANT PTNR MO TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, and the Clerk shall file the lodged petition for review nunc pro tunc to September 28, 2010. It is (MORE)
10/14/2010 F/O that the request for appointment of counsel is denied. It is F/O that petitioner shall within 20 days from the date of this order advise this court as to the identity of new counsel. Failure to comply with this order shall result in petitioner being deemed as proceeding pro se. It is administrative record within 60 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 17. (ETW)
10/14/2010CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO KIM
02/07/2013FiledMotion To Dismiss Appeal (Respondent)Granted
02/26/2013FiledOrder Granting Motion To Dismiss Appeal (Respondent)
02/26/2013FiledDismissed
03/22/2013FiledMandate