Case Information: 10-CM-1233 | |||
Short Caption: | MICHAEL LLOYD BINNS V. UNITED STATES | Classification: | Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Domestic Violence |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | DVM1438-10 | Filed Date: | 09/29/2010 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 09/29/2010 | Case Status: | Closed |
Record Completed: | 11/04/2010 | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | |
Briefs Completed: | |||
Argued/Submitted: | |||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: | 06/07/2011 | ||
Costs Waived |
Party Information | ||||||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | |||||||
Appellant | Michael Lloyd Binns | Y |
| |||||||||
Appellee | United States | N |
|
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
09/29/2010 | NOTICE OF APPEAL | |||
09/30/2010 | Filed | APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Larry Williams, Esquire (nunc pro tunc) | ||
10/14/2010 | On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Cedric Miller, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (By: JAC) | |||
10/14/2010 | APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Cedric Miller, Esquire | |||
11/04/2010 | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (114pgs/Johnson) 8/30/10 proc. w/CD included | |||
11/04/2010 | RECORD INDEX | |||
11/04/2010 | RECORD COPIES | |||
11/04/2010 | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (Pretrial Services report filed 6/21/10) | |||
11/04/2010 | RECORD COMPLETED | |||
11/09/2010 | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (Defendant's Exhibits #2 & #3 - photographs filed 8/30/10)(brown envelope) | |||
11/10/2010 | STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (additional rt but not ordered)dfe | |||
12/09/2010 | ORDERED: Sua sponte, that the appointment of Cedric Miller, Esquire, is hereby vacated, and Larry Williams, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal nunc pro tunc to September 30, 2010. Cedric Miller, Esquire, shall transmit all documents pertaining to this appeal to newly-appointed counsel forthwith. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (By: ETW) | |||
01/19/2011 | APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF until March 1, 2011 (no oppo) | |||
02/01/2011 | On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before March 1, 2011. (By: JAC) | |||
02/28/2011 | APPELLANT'S BRIEF | |||
02/28/2011 | APPENDIX | |||
04/04/2011 | APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE | |||
04/05/2011 | TMC - motion for summary affirmance - oppo - appellant's brief | |||
04/11/2011 | APPELLANT'S OPPOSITION - to aple's motion for summary affirmance | |||
05/16/2011 | ORDERED that the MTOION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE IS GRANTED...SEE HARDCOPY It is ****MORE**** | |||
05/16/2011 | FURTHER ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the judgment on appeal IS AFFIRMED. (RZTHPR) | |||
06/07/2011 | MANDATE ISSUED |