judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CRAIG WINSTEAD v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-08-0066)
Case Number:S-08-0066Case Docketed On:03/27/2008
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fifth Judicial District Big Horn CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:CRAIG WINSTEAD v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:CRAIG WINSTEAD, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantCraig WinsteadDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
David E. Westling
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
03/27/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
03/27/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
03/27/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
05/12/2008Motion - Dismiss - voluntary with waiver (waiver attached to original only).MotionDismiss - voluntary with waiverFinal
05/13/2008Event - Hardcopy received - motion for voluntary dismissal of appealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/13/2008Notice-Incoming - Waiver of appealNotice-IncomingWaiver of appealFinal
05/13/2008Order - Dismiss - voluntary or stipulatedOrderDismiss - voluntary or stipulatedFinal
05/13/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
08/25/2008Correspondence - Incoming - received letter from appellant requesting withdrawal of his voluntary dismissal.CorrespondenceIncomingFinal
08/25/2008Correspondence - Outgoing - responded indicating that the matter is closed.CorrespondenceOutgoingFinal
01/07/2009Correspondence - Incoming - Received letter re sentence reduction, called Public Defender, they received same letter and will respondCorrespondenceIncomingFinal