judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JUDD (JOHN) VS. STATE

Case Information: 38198
Short Caption:JUDD (JOHN) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR002056BClassification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/19/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
07/19/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Fast Track. (Fast track notice mailed to trial counsel.) 01-12321
07/30/2001Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 01-12787
08/06/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Show Cause. Response due from counsel for appellant: 20 days from the date of this order. fn1[This court notes that appellant apparently signed the notice of appeal before the expiration of the appeal period. It therefore appears possible that the notice of appeal was delivered to prison officials within the 30 days period, and may therefore be timely.] 01-13197
08/29/2001MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Order and for Suspension of Briefing Schedule Pending Resolution of Jurisdictional Question. 01-14608
09/06/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. filed August 29, 2001. Briefing of this appeal is suspended until further order of this court. Counsel for appellant shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file and serve the response to the order to show cause. 01-15063
10/04/2001Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Certified copy of Order Granting Request for Appointment of Counsel on Appeal filed in district court on October 1, 2001. 01-16726
10/08/2001MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. 01-16855
11/08/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On October 8, 2001, counsel for appellant submitted a response to this court's order filed August 6, 2001. Pursuant to Kellogg, we conclude that we have jurisdiction over this appeal. Counsel for appellant shall have 40 days from the date of this order to file and serve a fast track statement and appendix. Thereafter, this appeal shall proceed in accordance with the provisions of NRAP 3C. 01-18641
12/21/2001Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 01-21529
12/21/2001AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. 01-21530
01/11/2002Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 02-00856
03/12/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." NNP02-MS/RR/NB 02-04417
04/09/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-04627
04/09/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
04/15/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 11, 2002. 02-04627