Case Information: 38197 | |||
Short Caption: | D'AQUINO (OSCAR) VS. WARDEN | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR88P2159A | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
07/19/2001 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
07/19/2001 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 01-12319 | |
08/22/2001 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. The court hereby directs the attorney general to obtain and transmit to the clerk of this court, within 30 days from the date of this order, certified copies of any available prison records indicating the actual date upon which appellant delivered his notice of appeal to a prison official. If the prison records do not indicate that appellant delivered his notice of appeal to a prison official, the attorney general shall so inform this court. | 01-14220 | |
09/21/2001 | Motion | Filed Response to Order to Show Cause. Response to Court's Order. | 01-15972 | |
10/16/2001 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Having reviewed the response of the attorney general to this court's August 22, 2001 order, this court concludes that this appeal may proceed and that a review of the complete record is warranted. Record due: 120 days. fn1[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] | 01-17461 | |
11/20/2001 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Voluntary Dismissal. Order Dismissing Appeal and Vacating Prior Order Directing Transmission of Record on Appeal in Docket No. 38197. On October 16, 2001, this court received a proper person motion to withdraw appeal. The motion is granted, and " . . . we dismiss the appeal." Further, we vacate that portion of our October 16, 2001 order directing the clerk of the district court to transmit the record on appeal in Docket No. 38197.] SNP02-CY/DA/ML | 01-19456 | |
11/20/2001 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. No remittitur issued. |