judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

AZARIAH ISRAEL V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CF-1232
Short Caption:AZARIAH ISRAEL V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Homicide
Lead: 10-CF-1184 Consolidated:10-CF-1232
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF1-15429-07Filed Date:10/01/2010

Opening Event Date:10/01/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:01/10/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:Y
Briefs Completed:08/20/2012
Argued/Submitted:02/13/2013
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantAzariah Israel Y
Richard S. StolkerYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Elizabeth H. DanelloYY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
10/01/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
10/28/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Thomas Engle, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
10/28/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Thomas Engle, Esquire
11/29/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed (pii))
12/23/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#1 (88-pgs/hawkins 5/5/10 proc.)
12/23/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#2 (52-pgs/swaringer 5/11/10 proc.)
12/23/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#3 (170-pgs/janifer 5/11-13/10 proc.)
12/23/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#4 (187-pgs/ramos 5/17/10 proc.)
12/23/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#5 (191-pgs/ramos 5/18/10 proc.)
12/23/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#6 (192 of 596 pgs/ramos 5/19-20/10 proc.)
12/23/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD# 7 (24-pgs/ramos 5/21/10 proc.)
12/23/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#8 (567-pgs/pirfo 5/24-27/10 proc.)
12/23/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#9 (191-pgs/johnson 6/1/10 proc.)
12/23/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#10 (61-pgs/johnson 6/2/10 proc.)
12/23/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#11 (33-pgs/mccarn 6/7/10 proc.)
12/23/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#12 (49-pgs/mcarn 6/8/10 proc.)
12/23/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#13 (109-pgs/mccarn 6/9/10 proc.)
12/23/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#14 (23-pgs/mccarn 6/11/10 proc.)w/cd
01/10/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #15 (SEALED pleadings)
01/10/2011RECORD INDEX
01/10/2011RECORD COPIES
01/10/2011RECORD COMPLETED
01/13/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
02/22/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 6/30/11.
03/16/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before June 30, 2011. (Castillo)
06/14/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF until September 27, 2011 (no oppo)
06/22/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before September 27, 2011. Any further requests for extensions of time will be looked upon with disfavor and granted only upon a showing of good cause. (Castillo)
06/22/2011RECEIVED pro se letter from Appellant addressed to his court-appointed attorney regarding dissatisfaction for not forwarding copy of trial trasncripts to him.
08/30/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
09/16/2011FiledCounsel's Motion To Withdraw (Appellant)Granted
10/25/2011FiledOrder Granting Counsel's Motion To Withdraw (Appellant)
10/25/2011FiledAppointing new counsel/CJA Richard Stolker for Appellant.
12/01/2011FiledAnswer/Response to DCCA Order dated 10/25/11 re: ordered transcripts (Titled as: Statement Regarding Transcript) (Appellant)
02/22/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #16 (88 pgs/Hawkins) 5/5/10 proc.
02/22/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #17 (288 pgs/Janifer) 5/12-13/10 proc.
02/22/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #18 (22 pgs/Janifer) 9/17/10 proc. w/cd
02/22/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #19 (159 pgs/Swaringer) 5/9/11 proc.
02/22/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #20 (160-379 pgs/Swaringer) 5/10/11 proc
02/22/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #21 (121 pgs/Pirfo) 5/11/11 proc
02/22/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #22 (23 pgs/Swaringer) 5/12/11 proc
02/22/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #23 (24-36 pgs/Swaringer) 5/13/11 proc.
02/22/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #24 (11 pgs/tape) 5/31/11 proc w/cd
02/23/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
02/29/2012FiledMotion for authority to incur travel expense pursuant to Criminal Justice Act. (Appellant)Granted
03/09/2012FiledORDER GRANTING COUNSEL'S MOTION TO INCUR TRAVEL EXPENSES...and MOTION FOR EXTENTION OF TIME TO FILE THE BRIEF
05/08/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief until June 9, 2012 (Appellant)Granted
05/18/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief until June 7 2012 (Appellant)
06/07/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
06/26/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant) and the Clerk shall file lodged brief and limited appendix
06/26/2012FiledBrief (Appellant)
06/26/2012FiledAppendix (Appellant)
07/10/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee)Granted
07/13/2012FiledMotion To Consolidate (Appellee)
08/09/2012FiledOrder Granting Motion To Consolidate with 10-CF-1232. (Appellee) and Motion For Extension Of Time to File lodged Reply Brief (Appellant) in appeal no. 10-CF-1184
08/20/2012FiledAppendix (10-CF-1232) (Appellee)
08/20/2012FiledBrief (10-CF-1232) (Appellee)
08/20/2012FiledBriefing Completed
11/28/2012FiledLetter To Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring
11/28/2012FiledRule 28(k) Citation Of Supplemental Authority (Appellee)
12/04/2012FiledLetter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Appellee)
12/21/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
02/06/2013FiledRule 28(k) Citation Of Supplemental Authority (Appellant)
02/13/2013FiledArgued before Judges Glickman, Oberly, Reid, Richard S. Stolker, Esq. for appellant Azariah Israel Abram J. Pafford, Esq. for appellant Emanuel J. Jenkins Elizabeth H. Danello, Esq. for appellee
02/28/2013FiledRule 28(k) Citation Of Supplemental Authority (Israel) (Appellant)
07/01/2013FiledBriefing Order
07/26/2013FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File to supplemental brief Other (Appellee)Granted
08/05/2013FiledSupplemental Brief (Appellant)
08/05/2013FiledSupplemental Brief (Amicus Curiae)
08/05/2013FiledSupplemental Brief (Appellant)
08/05/2013FiledSupplemental Brief (Appellee)
08/09/2013FiledOrder Granting aple's motion for extension to file reply brief.
08/21/2013FiledMotion for clarification of schedule with respect to due dates for supplemental reply brief. (Jenkins) (Appellant)
08/29/2013FiledSupplemental Reply Brief (Appellant- Jenkins)
08/29/2013FiledSupplemental Reply Brief (Appellee)
09/06/2013FiledOrder Granting aplt's motion for clarification.
12/12/2013FiledAffirmed In Part/Reversed In Part (OPINION) (Glickman and Oberly, Associate Judges; and Reid, Senior Judge)
12/18/2013FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File petition for rehearing en banc (Appellee (pii)
12/19/2013FiledQualls Letter Filed (Appellant)
12/24/2013FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Petition for Rehearing En Banc (Appellant) (Jenkins)Granted
01/10/2014FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellee's and appellant's motion for extension of time within which to file the petitions for rehearing or rehearing en banc to January 25, 2014.
01/24/2014FiledPetition For Rehearing En Banc (Appellee)
01/27/2014FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Petition for rehearing/rehearing en banc (Jenkins) (Appellant)Granted
01/30/2014FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the petition for rehearing or rehearing en banc to February 3, 2014. (Jenkins)
02/03/2014FiledPetition For Rehearing En Banc (Jenkins) (Appellant)
02/24/2014FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Response to Appellant's petition for rehearing en banc Opposition/Reply/Answer (Appellee)Granted
03/04/2014FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellee's motion for an extension of time within which to file a response to appellant's petition to April 3, 2014.
04/02/2014FiledOpposition to petition for rehearing en banc (Appellee)
07/18/2014FiledOrdered that Richard S. Stolker, Esquire is hereby reappointed as counsel for appellant in appeal no. 10-CF-1232. F/O counsel for appellants and the Public Defender Service shall, within 14 days, each file a response to the government's petition for rehearing en banc.
07/22/2014FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File a response to petition for rehearing en banc (Appellant) (Israel)
07/23/2014FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant Azariah Isreal's motion for an extension of time within which to file a response to August 15, 2014.
07/28/2014FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File a response to petition for en banc rehearing (Amicus Curiae)Granted
08/08/2014FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Opposition/Reply/Answer (Amicus Curiae)Granted
08/19/2014FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to file a response to the petition for rehearing en banc (Israel) (Appellant)Granted
08/21/2014FiledGRANT - Order Granting the Public Defender Service's motions for an extensions of time to file a response to the governments petition are granted and the response shall be filed on August 29, 2014.
08/21/2014FiledOpposition to Petition for Rehearing En Banc (Amicus Curiae)
03/09/2015FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant Azariah Israel's motion for an extension of time to file an opposition to appellee's petition for rehearing en banc is granted, and the Clerk shall file appellant Azariah Israel's lodged opposition to appellee's petition for rehearing en banc.
03/09/2015FiledOpposition to appellee's petition for hearing (Appellant) (Isreal)
03/09/2015FiledOrder Denying appellee's petition for rehearing en banc.
06/30/2020FiledMotion To Recall The Mandate (Pro Se Appellant Jenkins)Denied
06/30/2020FiledTMC
07/17/2020FiledORDER DENYING appellant's motion to recall the mandate...