judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DANIEL ROBERT LATTA v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-08-0065)
Case Number:S-08-0065Case Docketed On:03/26/2008
Status:Closed
Original Court:Second Judicial District Carbon CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Controlled Substances 35-7-1001 - 35-7-1060
Short Title:DANIEL ROBERT LATTA v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:DANIEL ROBERT LATTA, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantDaniel Robert LattaDion James Custis
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Jeremy C. Schwendiman

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Search and Seizure -Traffic Stop
Opinion Number:2009 WY 35
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
03/26/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
03/26/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
03/26/2008Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
03/26/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
05/12/2008Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
05/15/2008Event - Phone Call. Received call from secretary at Attorney General's office regarding filing of brief of appellant. They still have not received a copy. Checked certificate of service - Mr. Custis indicated on service that it was sent by certified mail on 05/12/08. Ms. Briggs called his office and secretary said that she put it in the mail today, but not by certified mail. Adjusted due date accordingly.EventPhone CallFinal
05/19/2008Correspondence - Incoming. Received letter from Mr. Pauling regarding the service of brief of appellant. Distributed to court for possible action.CorrespondenceIncomingFinal
06/27/2008Brief - Appellee and received copy of brief on disk and designation of recordBriefAppelleeFinal
06/27/2008Notice-Incoming - Consent and Approval for Jeremy C. Schwendiman to appear on behalf of appelleeNotice-IncomingConsent and ApprovalFinal
07/16/2008Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
07/25/2008Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
07/25/2008Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, three volumes. Volume I, original papers; Volume II, Transcripts; Volume III, confidential folder.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
07/25/2008Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
09/19/2008Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
09/23/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Dion Custis for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
10/14/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Jeremy C. Schwendiman for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
10/21/2008Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Dion Custis for appellant; D. Michael Pauling, Senior Assistant Attorney General and Jeremy C. Schwendiman, Student Intern, argument by Mr. Schwendiman for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
10/21/2008Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
03/10/2009Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Hill writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
03/26/2009Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
03/26/2009Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
03/26/2009Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
03/26/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
03/30/2009Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 3/29/09.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal