judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JAMES M. HEAD V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CO-1246
Short Caption:JAMES M. HEAD V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Other - Den. Of Post-Conviction Relief
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:FEL107618-77Filed Date:02/16/2010

Opening Event Date:02/16/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:11/03/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:01/26/2011
Argued/Submitted:05/25/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:07/05/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJames M. Head Y
Paul D. HuntYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
02/16/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
10/21/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal, and it appearing that no transcript is needed for this appeal, it is ORDERED that a briefing order will be issued upon the filing in this court, by the Clerk of the Superior Court, of the record index and record copies in accordance with D.C. App. R. 11 (b)(3)(A). (By: JAC)
11/03/2010RECORD INDEX
11/03/2010RECORD COPIES
11/03/2010RECORD COMPLETED
11/18/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
12/28/2010APPELLANT'S BRIEF
12/28/2010APPENDIX
01/26/2011APPELLEE'S BRIEF
01/26/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
03/18/2011FINAL SCREENING - SUMMARY CALENDAR I
04/05/2011CALENDAR NOTICE SENT
05/25/2011FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
05/25/2011SUBMITTED to Judges Washington, Oberly, Kern
06/10/2011AFFIRMED (MOJ) (washington, Chief Judge, Oberly, Associate Judge, and Kern, Senior Judge.)
07/05/2011MANDATE ISSUED
01/25/2012FiledNotice Of Denial Of Pet. For Writ Of Certiorari (Appellant)