judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

LAWSON (DONALD) VS. STATE

Case Information: 38211
Short Caption:LAWSON (DONALD) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 40934 , 43982
Lower Court Case(s):Douglas Co. - Ninth Judicial District - CR0030Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/20/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
07/20/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 01-12407
08/03/2001TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: June 19, 2001. Court Reporter: Joan Wilder. 01-13159
08/28/2001Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Fast Track Statement due: September 5, 2001. 01-14588
08/30/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On June 18, 2001, appellant in Docket No. 36387 filed a transcript request form requesting the preparation of a transcript by court reporter Joan Wilder. Further review of our records indicates that the requested transcript was inadvertently filed in Docket No. 38211 on August 3, 2001. We vacate the August 23, 2001, order entered in Docket No. 36387. The clerk of this court shall remove the certified transcript for proceedings conducted on September 21, 1998, from Docket No. 38211 and file the transcript in Docket No. 36387. 01-14694
09/04/2001Other Returned Unfiled Document. (Appendix attached.)
09/14/2001Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 01-15588
09/14/2001AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 01-15589
09/25/2001Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 01-16166
09/25/2001AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Response. 01-16167
10/11/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. 'ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED.' SNP02Y-CY/DA/ML 01-17154
11/07/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-17346
11/07/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
11/14/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 9, 2001. 01-17346