judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JOSEPH KRAFCZIK, JR., Administrator of the Estate of Allan H. Krafczik v. TANAYA MOON MORRIS

Case Heading (S-08-0079)
Case Number:S-08-0079Case Docketed On:04/09/2008
Linked To: S-08-0003
Status:Closed
Original Court:Second Judicial District Albany CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Wills, Decedents' Estates and Probate Code (Title 2)
Short Title:JOSEPH KRAFCZIK, JR., Administrator of the Estate of Allan H. Krafczik v. TANAYA MOON MORRIS
Full Title:JOSEPH KRAFCZIK, JR., Administrator of the Estate of Allan H. Krafczik, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. TANAYA MOON MORRIS, Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantJoseph Krafczik Jr.Steve C.M. Aron
AppellantChristine KrafczikSteve C.M. Aron
AppelleeTanaya Moon MorrisJason M. Tangeman
Stacy L. Rostad

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2009 WY 53
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
04/09/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
04/09/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
04/09/2008Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
04/09/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
05/27/2008Brief - Appellant and received copy of designation of record on appealBriefAppellantFinal
05/29/2008Order - Other - report on appointment of personal representative and order consolidating appealsOrderOtherFinal
05/30/2008Motion - Dismiss - involuntaryMotionDismiss - involuntaryFinal
06/06/2008Notice-Incoming - Other - motion to substitute partyNotice-IncomingOtherFinal
06/24/2008Order - Denying motions to dismiss appeals and order granting motion to substitute party (Caption amended pursuant to order) (order file stamped with wrong date--original order corrected)OrderDenyFinal
07/10/2008Event - Phone Call - contacted counsel for appellee regarding electronic filing of brief. He had missed calendaring the brief and may file motion for extension. Advised must be electronic filing now - he will take course.EventPhone CallFinal
07/10/2008Motion - Extension of time - brief of appelleeMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
07/10/2008Order - Grant - extension of time to file brief of appelleeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
07/14/2008Event - Hardcopy received motion for extension of timeEventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/14/2008Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
07/15/2008Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of AppelleeEventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/01/2008Brief - Appellant reply (S-08-0079)BriefAppellant replyFinal
08/04/2008Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
08/04/2008Event - Hardcopy received appellant's reply briefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/08/2008Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
08/08/2008Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, one volume, original papers.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
08/08/2008Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
09/15/2008Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
09/18/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Jason Tangeman for appelleeNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
09/18/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - C.M. Aron for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
10/23/2008Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court at the University of Wyoming (Steve C.M. Aron for appellant; Jason M. Tangeman for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
04/13/2009Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Burke writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
04/29/2009Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
04/29/2009Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
04/29/2009Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
04/29/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal