judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-2707
A-2707
05/10/1950
Application for Writ of Error
JOE B. COLE, ET AL.
CITY OF DALLAS
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/21/1950Motion for RehearingPetitioner
05/20/1950Response to PetitionRespondent
05/10/1950Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
06/28/1950Response to Motion filed
06/21/1950Motion for RehearingOverruled
05/20/1950Response to Petition
05/17/1950Document received (See Remarks)
05/10/1950Application for Writ of Error - Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
City of DallasRespondent
Joe B. Cole, et al.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information