judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ASKWITH VS. DISTRICT COURT

Case Information: 38210
Short Caption:ASKWITH VS. DISTRICT COURTCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 37650 , 37770 , 37897 , 41277
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A361384Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Proper Person Writ Petition
Disqualifications:GibbonsCase Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/20/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee due.
07/20/2001Petition/WritFiled Proper Person Petition for Writ. Plaintiff William H. Askwith's Writ Pursuant to NRAP 21 et seq for Miller to Surrender Files [and] Relief from Order Tied to March 26, 2001 as to Possession of Askwiths Funds. 01-12403
07/20/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days
07/26/2001Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from William Askwith-Western Union Money Order No. 06-391484154.
08/06/2001Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. from attorney Victor Lee Miller informing this court that he was not served with a copy of the proper person writ petition. 01-13232
12/12/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition. Order of Affirmance (No. 37897) and Order Denying Petition for Writ of Mandamus (No. 38210). fn1[We direct the clerk of this court to correct the caption on this court's docket in No. 38210 to conform with the caption on this order.] fn2[Although appellant/petitioner was not granted leave to file papers in proper person, see NRAP 46(b), we have considered all documents received from him. We deny as moot appellant's motion to expedite.] fn3[We note that documents appended to a motion received in the appeal show that, in January 2002, the district court granted Askwith's motion to release the remainder of the judgment funds to him and that Askwith received a district court check for $45,559.04, which he endorsed 'under-duress.' To the extent that the writ petition seeks to compel the release of these funds it is moot.] We affirm the order adjudicating Miller's Lien and disbursing judgment funds to him. (No. 37897). "We deny the petition for a writ of mandamus." (No. 38210). NNP03Y-CY/RR/DA. Nos. 37897/38210-cases are not consolidated. 02-21278
01/06/2003OtherDisqualification of Justice Gibbons. Sat in district court proceedings.
02/04/2003Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order/Rehearing Denied. Askwith has not provided any basis for granting rehearing; therefore, " . . . rehearing is denied." NNP03Y-DA/RR. Nos. 37897/38210-cases are not consolidated. NNP03Y-DA/RR. 03-01921
03/04/2003RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. 03-02082
03/04/2003Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
04/07/2003Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. addressed to William Askwith regarding letter dated March 31, 2003.