judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

PHILIP WHITE and KATHLEEN D. WHITE v. WILLARD M. WOODS and CYNTHIA S. WOODS

Case Heading (S-08-0078)
Case Number:S-08-0078Case Docketed On:04/07/2008
Linked To: S-08-0085
Status:Closed
Original Court:Second Judicial District Albany CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Property, Conveyances and Security Transactions (Title 34)
Short Title:PHILIP WHITE and KATHLEEN D. WHITE v. WILLARD M. WOODS and CYNTHIA S. WOODS
Full Title:PHILIP WHITE and KATHLEEN D. WHITE, Appellants (Defendants), v. WILLARD M. WOODS and CYNTHIA S. WOODS, Appellees (Plaintiffs).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantKathleen D. WhitePhilip White Jr.
AppellantPhilip White Jr. Pro Se
AppelleeWillard M. WoodsFrank J. Jones
AppelleeCynthia S. WoodsFrank J. Jones

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Property - Real, Taxation
Opinion Number:2009 WY 29A
Citation:208 P.3d 597

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
04/07/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
04/07/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
04/07/2008Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
04/07/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
04/28/2008Brief - Appellants and received copy of designation of record (improperly captioned in Supreme Court)BriefAppellantFinal
06/05/2008Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
06/05/2008Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
07/07/2008Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
07/07/2008Event - Hardcopy received brief of appelleeEventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/08/2008Notice-Incoming - Errata to brief of appellee.Notice-IncomingErrataFinal
07/09/2008Event - Hardcopy received submission of corrections to appellees' briefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/17/2008Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
07/21/2008Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
07/22/2008Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
07/22/2008Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant reply; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/28/2008Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
07/28/2008Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, two volumes. Volumes I-II, Original Papers.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
07/28/2008Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
07/30/2008Order - Consolidating cases (with S-08-0085)OrderConsolidating casesFinal
07/30/2008Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
03/06/2009Opinion - Opinion and journal order reversing and remanding. Justice Burke writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
03/06/2009Correspondence - Outgoing. Sent letter to counsel regarding email communication to court.CorrespondenceOutgoingFinal
03/18/2009Petition - ClarificationPetitionClarificationFinal
03/19/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Petition for Partial Clarification or CorrectionEventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/02/2009Order - Deny - Order Denying Petition for Rehearing and Order Amending OpinionOrderDenyFinal
04/02/2009Opinion - Opinion and journal order reversing and remanding amended opinion, Justice Burke writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
04/02/2009Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
04/02/2009Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
04/02/2009Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
04/02/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
04/06/2009Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for (undated).ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal
05/18/2009Notice-Incoming - Other - received copy of Defendant Whites' motion to enforce Supreme Court's award of costs, filed in district court by Mr. White. No action necessary.Notice-IncomingOtherFinal