judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JUNE C. LOVE V. DC DEP'T OF EMPLOYMENT SVCS.

Case Information: 10-AA-1243
Short Caption:JUNE C. LOVE V. DC DEP'T OF EMPLOYMENT SVCS.Classification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Worker's Compensation
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CRB139-09Filed Date:10/07/2010

Opening Event Date:10/07/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:10/27/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:01/28/2011
Argued/Submitted:06/02/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:07/22/2011

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
Intervenor-RespondentSunrise At N
Michael H. Daney YN
Intervenor-RespondentSedgwick Cms, Inc., InsurerN
Michael H. Daney YN
PetitionerJune C. Love N
Matthew J. PefferYY
RespondentD.C. Department of Employment Services - Worker's Comp.N
Todd S. KimNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
10/07/2010PETITION FOR REVIEW
10/07/2010FILING FEE of $100.00.
10/07/2010CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO BOARD, Todd Kim, Esq. and Gregory Lamb, Esq.
10/26/2010NOTICE OF INTENT TO INTERVENE Sunrise at Grand Oaks and Sedwick CMS, Inc.
10/27/2010RECORD ON APPEAL
10/27/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD (5/19/09 proc.)
10/27/2010RECORD COMPLETED
11/03/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that petitioner's brief and the appendix shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and respondent's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 30, 31. (JAC)
12/13/2010PETITIONER'S BRIEF
12/13/2010APPENDIX to Petitioner's Brief.
01/10/2011INTERVENOR'S BRIEF
01/13/2011RESPONDENT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF until February 1, 2011 (no oppo) (DC)
01/19/2011 On consideration of respondent's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that respondent's motion is granted and the brief of respondent shall be filed on or before February 1, 2011. (JAC)
01/28/2011MEMORANDUM/STATEMENT IN LIEU OF BRIEF
01/28/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
03/18/2011FINAL SCREENING - SUMMARY CALENDAR I
05/05/2011CALENDAR NOTICE SENT
06/02/2011FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
06/02/2011SUBMITTED before Judges Glickman, Oberly, Belson
06/30/2011FiledAFFIRMED (MOJ) (Glickman and Oberly, Associate Judges, and Belson, Senior Judge.)
07/22/2011FiledMandate