judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

TERRANCE CROSSLAND V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CM-1234
Short Caption:TERRANCE CROSSLAND V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Assault Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CMD7254-10Filed Date:09/29/2010

Opening Event Date:09/29/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:11/23/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:Y
Briefs Completed:06/02/2011
Argued/Submitted:11/10/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/13/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantTerrance Crossland Y
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Kathleen A. Connolly YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
09/29/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
10/14/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Regina Michaels, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (By: JAC)
10/14/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Regina Michaels, Esquire
11/01/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (rt ordered/needed)dfe
11/23/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (135pgs/Tape) 9/14/10 proc.
11/23/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (34pgs/Tape) 9/15/10 proc.
11/23/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (14pgs/Tape) 9/23/10 proc. w/CD
11/23/2010RECORD COMPLETED
12/02/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
12/02/2010RECORD INDEX
12/02/2010RECORD COPIES
01/07/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF until March 31, 2011 (unopposed)
01/19/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before March 31, 2011. (By: JAC)
03/31/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
03/31/2011APPENDIX to Appellant's Brief.
05/02/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 31 days. no oppo
05/12/2011 On consideration of appellee's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellee's brief shall be filed on or before June 2, 2011. (By: JAC)
06/02/2011APPELLEE'S BRIEF
06/02/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
06/16/2011FiledFinal Screening - Summary
06/22/2011APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF
10/04/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
11/10/2011FiledSubmitted to Judges Thompson, Fisher, Schwelb
12/15/2011FiledAffirmed (OPINION)
12/29/2011FiledPetition For Rehearing/Rehearing En Banc (Appellant)
02/22/2012FiledOrder Denying appellant's petition for reh/reh en banc
03/13/2012FiledMandate
03/30/2012FiledQualls Letter Filed (Appellant)