judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SPAULDING VS. DISTRICT COURT

Case Information: 38199
Short Caption:SPAULDING VS. DISTRICT COURTCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 34595 , 38677
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - DV9600301Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Proper Person Writ Petition
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/20/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
07/20/2001Petition/WritFiled Proper Person Petition for Writ. Petition for Writ of Mandamus in Alternative: Writ of Prohibition. 01-12357
07/26/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Answer Writ Petition. The real party in interest, on behalf of respondents, shall have 10 days from the date of this order within which to file an answer, including authorities, against issuance of the requested writ. 01-12668
08/07/2001Petition/WritFiled Answer to Petition for Writ. 01-13310
08/09/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. for Answer to Petition for Writ. 01-13505
08/22/2001MotionFiled Motion to Strike. 01-14259
10/02/2001Petition/WritFiled Answer to Petition for Writ. Supplement to Answer to Petition for Writ of Mandamus in the Alternate: Writ of Prohibition. 01-16592
10/11/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition. Denying Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition. "ORDER the petition DENIED." fn1[Although petitioner was not granted leave to file papers in proper person, we have considered the proper person documents received from petitioner. We deny as moot petitioner's July 31, 2001, request for a stay pending our resolution of the writ petition, and real party in interest's August 22, 2001 motion to strike. We direct the clerk of this court to file real party in interest's August 9, 2001 response to the motion for stay.] SNP02Y-CY/DA/ML 01-17118
10/11/2001MotionFiled Response to Motion. 01-13506
11/07/2001RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. 01-17323
11/07/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.