judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JAMES ALLEN ROESCH v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-08-0067)
Case Number:S-08-0067Case Docketed On:03/27/2008
Linked To: S-08-0068
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against Property 6-3-101 - 6-3-901
Short Title:JAMES ALLEN ROESCH v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:JAMES ALLEN ROESCH, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantJames Allen RoeschDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
Michael H. Reese
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Leda M. Pojman

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Sentencing
Opinion Number:2008 WY 141
Citation:196 P.3d 795 (Wyo. 2008)

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
03/27/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
03/27/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
03/27/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
05/14/2008Brief - Appellant; received copy of brief on cd; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.BriefAppellantFinal
05/29/2008Correspondence - Incoming other - received "Supplemental Opening Brief of Appellant (Pro se)".CorrespondenceIncoming otherFinal
05/29/2008Correspondence - Outgoing other - sent letter to appellant regarding seeking permission of the court to file a supplemental pro se brief.CorrespondenceOutgoing otherFinal
06/05/2008Motion - Other - motion to accept supplemental opening brief of appellant filed pro seMotionOtherFinal
06/05/2008Event - Phone Call - received call from Leda Pojman indicating that counsel for appellant may also file a motion to allowing appellant to submit a supplemental brief pro se. If so, they will respond to both at the same time.EventPhone CallFinal
06/06/2008Motion - Other - motion for leave for defendant to file supplemental briefMotionOtherFinal
06/09/2008Response/Objection - Motion to accept supplemental opening brief of appellant filed pro se and motion for leave for defendant to file supplemental briefResponse/ObjectionMotionFinal
06/18/2008Order - Deny appellant's motions for leave to file pro se supplemental briefOrderDenyFinal
06/26/2008Brief - Appellee and copy of designation of record on appeal and brief on diskBriefAppelleeFinal
06/30/2008Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
07/15/2008Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
07/15/2008Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
07/28/2008Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, two volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcripts.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
07/28/2008Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
12/02/2008Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Kite writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
12/19/2008Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
12/19/2008Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
12/19/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
12/19/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
12/23/2008Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 12/21/08.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal