judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

IN RE: DISCIPLINE OF MCDONALD

Case Information: 38200
Short Caption:IN RE: DISCIPLINE OF MCDONALDCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):NONEClassification:Bar Matter - Discipline - Petition
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/20/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
07/20/2001Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record of Bar Proceedings. Vols. 1 and 2. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 01-12359
07/20/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Briefing Schedule/Bar Discipline.
12/06/2001Order/Dispositional BarFiled Bar Discipline Order. Order of Stayed Suspension and Public Reprimand. We conclude tht clear and convincing evidence supports the violations found by the panel. We also conclude that the recommended discipline, as reflected in the hearing transcript, is consistent with previous discipline cases. "McDonald is suspended for a period of six months, with the suspension to be stayed on the condition that he limit his practice to court-appointed criminal defense cases until July 1, 2003. In addition, we hereby publicly reprimand McDonald for his violations of SCR 151, SCR 153, SCR 154, SCR 166(4), and SCR 200(2). " McDonald may, however, conclude any matters pending at the time of the disciplinary hearing. McDonald must provide bar counsel with quarterly reports demonstrating his compliance. In addition, we hereby publicly reprimand McDonald for his violations of SCR 151, SCR 153, SCR 154, SCR 166(4), and SCR 200(2). McDonald shall pay the costs of this disciplinary proceeding. In the event that mcDonald fails to abide by any of these conditions during the probationary period, then the hearing panel shall have continuing jurisdiction to recommend that we immediately suspend McDonald. fn3[This is our final disposition of this matter. Any new proceedings concerning McDonald shall be docketed under a new docket number.] EN BANC 01-20492
01/02/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-20778
01/02/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
04/18/2002RemittiturIssued Return Letter. Returned Record on Appeal, Vols. 1 and 2 this day. 01-20778
04/29/2002RemittiturFiled Letter: Entered Receipt for Documents. Received by County Clerk on April 24, 2002. 01-20778
05/09/2003RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 5, 2003. 01-20778