judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

IN THE MATTER OF THE WORKER'S COMPENSATION CLAIM OF: ELMER CHAVEZ v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION

Case Heading (S-08-0069)
Case Number:S-08-0069Case Docketed On:03/27/2008
Status:Closed
Original Court:Eighth Judicial District Goshen CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Labor and Employment (Title 27)
Short Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE WORKER'S COMPENSATION CLAIM OF: ELMER CHAVEZ v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION
Full Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE WORKER'S COMPENSATION CLAIM OF: ELMER CHAVEZ, Appellant (Petitioner), v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION, Appellee (Respondent).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantElmer ChavezEthelyn (Lynn) Boak
AppelleeDepartment of Employment - Workers' Safety and Compensation DivisionBruce A. Salzburg
James Michael Causey
John William Renneisen

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Workers' Compensation
Opinion Number:2009 WY 46
Citation:204 P.3d 967

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
03/27/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
03/27/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
03/27/2008Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
03/27/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
04/04/2008Notice-Incoming - Entry of appearance for Lynn Boak to appear on behalf of appellantNotice-IncomingEntry of appearanceFinal
04/14/2008Motion - Withdrawal of counsel for the appellantMotionWithdrawal of counselFinal
04/14/2008Motion - Fees and costsMotionFees and costsFinal
04/14/2008Notice-Incoming - Other - notice of withdrawal and substitution of counselNotice-IncomingOtherFinal
04/29/2008Order - Awarding attorney fees and costs and order granting motion to withdraw as counselOrderAwarding attorney fees and costsFinal
05/12/2008Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
05/12/2008Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
06/10/2008Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
06/10/2008Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
07/10/2008Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
07/11/2008Event - Hardcopy received - motion for extension of timeEventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/11/2008Order - Grant - third extension of timeOrderGrant - third extension of timeFinal
08/08/2008Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
08/11/2008Event - Hardcopy received brief of appellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/25/2008Brief - Appellee; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.BriefAppelleeFinal
09/25/2008Event - Hardcopy received - brief of appelleeEventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/29/2008Notice-Incoming - Designation of record - appellee'sNotice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
10/01/2008Notice-Incoming - Designation of record from counsel for appellantNotice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
10/01/2008Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
10/14/2008Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
10/14/2008Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
10/23/2008Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, two volumes. Volume I, original papers; Volume II, agency record.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
10/23/2008Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
03/31/2009Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Burke writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
04/07/2009Motion - Fees and costsMotionFees and costsFinal
04/09/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for attorney's fees and costs; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/28/2009Order - Awarding attorney fees and costsOrderAwarding attorney fees and costsFinal
04/28/2009Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
04/28/2009Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
04/28/2009Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
04/28/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
04/30/2009Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 4/29/09.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal