judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

PEDRO N. RICH V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CM-1235
Short Caption:PEDRO N. RICH V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CMD9656-10Filed Date:09/29/2010

Opening Event Date:09/29/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:12/07/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:06/27/2011
Argued/Submitted:11/17/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/23/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantPedro N. Rich YPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Kristina L. AmentYY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
09/29/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
10/14/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that William Morrison, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (By: JAC)
10/14/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) William Morrison, Esquire
12/01/2010 On consideration of this court's order of October 14, 2010, directing counsel for appellant to file the statement regarding transcript within 30 days and it appearing that the statement regarding transcript has not been filed, it is ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall within 15 days from the date of this order submit the statement regarding transcript, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the document or to request an extension of time within which to do so. (CASTILLO)
12/07/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (104pgs/Tape) 9/22/10 proc.
12/07/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (85pgs/Tape) 9/24/10 proc. w/CD
12/07/2010RECORD INDEX
12/07/2010RECORD COPIES
12/07/2010RECORD COMPLETED
12/15/2010MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE STATEMENT RE TRANSCRIPT no oppo
12/15/2010RECEIVED - aplt's statement regarding transcripts
01/04/2011ORD GR MOT FOR LV TO FILE STATEMENT RE TRANSCIPT and the lodged statement regarding transcript is filed. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafer. See D.C. App. R. 31. (By: JAC)
01/04/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S)
02/16/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF no oppo to 60 days
02/25/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before April 15, 2011. Any further requests for extensions of time will be looked upon with disfavor and granted only upon a showing of good cause. (By: JAC)
04/18/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF no oppo
04/18/2011RECEIVED - aplt's brief w/appdx.
05/03/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for leave to late file the lodged brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that appellant's motion is granted and the lodged brief and limited appendix are filed. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the brief of appellee_ shall be filed with this court within 30 days from the date of this order. (By: JAC)
05/03/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF/appendix
06/01/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF until June 16, 2011
06/16/2011RECEIVED - aple's brief
06/27/2011 On consideration of appellee's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, and the lodged brief, it is ORDERED that appellee's motion is granted and the lodged brief is filed. It is FURTHER ORDERED that this appeal shall be scheduled for consideration before a merits division as soon as the calendar permits. (By: JAC)
06/27/2011APPELLEE'S BRIEF
06/27/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
08/10/2011FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring
10/04/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
11/17/2011FiledSubmitted to Judges Thompson, Oberly, Newman
11/29/2011FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Thompson and Oberly, Associate Judges, and Newman, Senior Judge.)
12/16/2011FiledQualls Letter Filed (Appellant)
12/23/2011FiledMandate