judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

TATUM (MICHAEL) VS. STATE

Case Information: 38201
Short Caption:TATUM (MICHAEL) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C170310Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:12/13/2002How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/20/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
07/20/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Fast Track. (Fast track notice mailed to trial counsel.) 01-12377
07/27/2001Order/CounselFiled Order/Fast Track/Counsel. Appellant filed his notice of appeal in proper person. This appeal is governed by NRAP 3C. It appears that appellant was represented by Gloria Navarro during the lower court proceedings. Attorney Navarro shall file the transcript request form within 10 days and a fast track statement within 40 days. Thereafter, this appeal shall proceed in accordance with the provisions of NRAP 3C. 01-12711
08/06/2001Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 3/21/01; 6/18/01. Court Reporter: Debra Van Blaircom. Filed in district court on: July 17, 2001. Transcripts requested: 2/21/01; 3/21/01; 3/26/01; 4/5/01; 4/6/01. Court Reporter: Kristine Cornelius. Filed in district court on: July 17, 2001. Transcripts requested. 11/13/00. Court Reporter: Patsy Smith. Filed in district court on: July 17, 2001. 01-13244
08/06/2001Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 11/13/00. Court Reporter: Patsy Smith. Filed in district court on: July 31, 2001. Transcripts requested: 2/21/01; 3/21/01; 3/26/01; 3/27/01; 3/28/01; 3/29/01; 4/2/01; 4/3/01; 4/5/01. Court Reporter: Kristine Cornelius. Filed in district court on: July 31, 2001. Transcripts requested: 3/21/01; 6/18/01. Court Reporter: Debra Van Blaircom. Filed in district court on: July 31, 2001. Transcripts requested: 4/4/01. Court Reporters: Melissa Davis and Kristine Cornelius. Filed in district court on: July 31, 2001. 01-13249
08/20/2001Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). (Amended). Transcripts requested: 11/13/00, 3/21/01, 3/26/01, 3/26 to 4/5/01, 6/18/01. Court Reporter: Patsy Smith and Kristine Cornelius. Filed in district court on: August 16, 2001. 01-14074
08/27/2001TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: 11/13/00. Court Reporter: Patsy Smith. 01-14454
09/06/2001MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 01-15020
09/10/2001TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 03/21/01; 03/26/01; 03/27/01; 03/28/01, 03/29/01 and 04/02/01 - 04/05/01- Vol. 1. Court Reporter: Kristine Cornelius. 01-15229
09/10/2001TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: 03/29/01; 04/02/01; 04/03/01; 04/04/01; 04/05/01 and 06/08/01. Court Reporter: Kristine Cornelius. 01-15230
09/11/2001Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. filed September 6, 2001. Appellant shall have to and including September 17, 2001, to file and serve the fast track statement. 01-15305
09/14/2001MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 01-15558
09/21/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance. Gloria Navarro has joined the office of the Special Public Defender and will remain appellate counsel in this matter. 01-16018
09/24/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. filed September 24, 2001. Counsel for appellant shall have 20 days from the date of this order to file and serve the fast track statement and appendix. 01-16026
09/26/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. to appellant Michael Tatum in response to letter received on September 4, 2001 with regards to Fast Track Appeal.
10/17/2001MotionFiled Motion for Excess Pages. 01-17555
10/23/2001Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. filed October 17, 2001. The clerk shall file the thirteen page fast track statement and appendix received on October 17, 2001. Respondent shall have 20 days from the date of this order to file and serve the fast track response. 01-17798
10/23/2001Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 01-17556
10/23/2001AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Volumes 1 and 2. 01-17557
11/08/2001MotionFiled Motion for Excess Pages. Motion for Leave to file 13 page Fast Track Response. 01-18638
11/09/2001Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. filed November 8, 2001. The clerk shall file the 13-page fast track response and respondent's fast track appendix received on November 8, 2001. 01-18721
11/09/2001Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 01-18639
11/09/2001AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Response. 01-18640
12/11/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Full Briefing. We have determined that full briefing will assist the court in the disposition of this appeal. Opening brief due: 40 days. fn1[If a party's brief will cite to documents not previously filed in this court, that party shall file and serve an appropriately documented supplemental appendix with the brief.] fn2[We suspend the requirement in NRAP 9 for counsel to file a certified transcript.] Answering brief and reply brief shall be filed in compliance with NRAP 31. 01-20734
01/25/2002MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 02-01721
02/04/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. filed January 25, 2002. Appellant shall file and serve the opening brief and appendix. No further extensions of time shall be permitted absent demonstration of extreme and unforeseeable circumstances. 02-02204
03/21/2002BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: Express-No postmark. Signed by: Gloria M. Navarro. 02-05093
04/18/2002MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: May 20, 2002. 02-06922
05/22/2002BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: Express-No postmark. 02-08967
06/25/2002BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: Express-No postmark. 02-10928
12/13/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Southern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. 02-21308
12/13/2002Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. To the Southern Nevada Panel. SNP03-MS/ML/NB.
03/17/2003Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP03-MS/ML/NB 03-04395
04/11/2003RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 03-04613
04/11/2003Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
04/28/2003RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 14, 2003. 03-04613