judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

RASHAUN ADKINS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CM-1236
Short Caption:RASHAUN ADKINS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Assault Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CMD11400-10Filed Date:09/29/2010

Opening Event Date:09/29/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:11/09/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:05/11/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantRashaun Adkins Y
Cynthia NordoneYN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Kevin A. Chambers NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
09/29/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
10/14/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Cynthia Nordone, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (By: JAC)
10/14/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Cynthia Nordone, Esquire
11/09/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (111 pgs/Tape - 9/23/10 proc.)(w/CD)
11/09/2010RECORD COMPLETED
11/10/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S)
11/17/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
11/19/2010RECORD INDEX
11/19/2010RECORD COPIES
11/19/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (Pretrial Services report filed 6/24/10)****SEALED
12/24/2010APPELLANT'S BRIEF
12/24/2010APPENDIX (attached to brief)
01/28/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE
02/02/2011TMC - motion for summary affirmance - oppo - appellant's brief/appendix
02/04/2011APPELLANT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE- to aple's motion for summary affirmance
03/14/2011 ORDERED that APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE IS GRANTED. See Oliver T. Carr Mgmt Inc. v. Nat'l Deli Inc., 397 A.2d 914, 915 (DC 1979)...SEE HARDCOPY It is ****MORE****
03/14/2011 FURTHER ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the judgment on appeal be and hereby is AFFIRMED. (RDKRTE) (rf)
03/22/2011APLT'S PETITION FOR REHEARING/REHEARING EN BANC
04/19/2011ORD DENY APPELLANT'S PETITION FOR REH/REH EN BANC (WHRZGLKRFIBRTHOBRDTE) (Judge Reid was an Associate Judge of the court at the time of decision. Her status changed to Associate Judge, Retired, on April 7, 2011.)
05/11/2011MANDATE ISSUED
10/11/2011FiledNotice Of Denial Of Pet. For Writ Of Certiorari on October 3, 2011 (Appellant)Denied