judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

JUANITA QUIROZ, ET AL. v. FRED GARCIA

Case: A-2705
A-2705
05/17/1950
Application for Writ of Error
JUANITA QUIROZ, ET AL.
FRED GARCIA
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
07/20/1950Motion for RehearingPetitioner
06/05/1950Response to PetitionRespondent
05/17/1950Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
08/10/1950Response to Motion filed
07/20/1950Motion for RehearingOverruled
06/05/1950Response to Petition
05/22/1950Motion for Extension of Time filed
05/17/1950Application for Writ of Error - Filed
05/17/1950Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Fred GarciaRespondent
Juanita Quiroz, et al.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information