Case Information: 10-CV-1241 | |||
Short Caption: | CURTIS E. CRAWFORD V. ADRIANNE TODMAN | Classification: | Appeals - Civil - Contracts |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | CAB2288-10 | Filed Date: | 09/30/2010 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 09/30/2010 | Case Status: | Closed |
Record Completed: | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | ||
Briefs Completed: | |||
Argued/Submitted: | |||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: | 12/14/2010 | ||
Costs Waived |
Party Information | |||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | ||||
Appellant | Curtis E. Crawford | Y | Pro Se | N | |||||
Appellee | D.C. Housing Authority | N |
| ||||||
Appellee | Adrianne Todman | N |
| ||||||
Appellee | Moone | N |
| ||||||
Appellee | Jim Mccray | N |
| ||||||
Appellee | Amilia Marshall | N |
| ||||||
Appellee | Nancy Tayor | N |
| ||||||
Appellee | Lorry Bonds | N |
| ||||||
Appellee | Dawn Smeriglio | N |
|
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
09/30/2010 | NOTICE OF APPEAL | |||
10/25/2010 | ORDERED that APPELLANT SHALL W/N 20 DAYS from the date of this order, SHOW CAUSE hwy this appeal should not be dismissed for having been PREMATURELY FILED... (BY: ETW) | |||
10/25/2010 | TMC - OTSC - ROTSC | |||
11/09/2010 | RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE | |||
11/22/2010 | ORDERED that THIS APPEAL IS DISMISSED AS PREMATURELY FILED but W/O PREJUDICE to appelalnt fiing a new appeal once all matters have been resolved. (OBNBFA) (rm) | |||
11/22/2010 | DISMISSED | |||
12/14/2010 | MANDATE ISSUED | |||
04/17/2014 | Filed | Archived |