judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SMEDLEY (CHARLES) VS. STATE

Case Information: 38208
Short Caption:SMEDLEY (CHARLES) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR001865Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/20/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
07/20/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 01-12392
07/20/2001Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: February 9, 2001, March 22, 2001, June 7, 2001 and June 21, 2001. Court Reporter: Debbie P. Vieira. Filed in district court on: July 18, 2001. 01-12393
08/16/2001TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: February 9, 2001, March 22, 2001, June 7, 2001 and June 21, 2001. Court Reporter: Debbie P. Vieira. 01-13956
08/28/2001Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 01-14574
08/28/2001AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. 01-14575
09/18/2001Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 01-15789
11/01/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." NNP02-MS/RR/NB 01-18282
11/27/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-18335
11/27/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
12/06/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 30, 2001. 01-18335