judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JOAN BURT, ET AL V. RIVER PARK MUTUAL HOMES, INC.

Case Information: 10-CV-1240
Short Caption:JOAN BURT, ET AL V. RIVER PARK MUTUAL HOMES, INC.Classification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAR2459-09Filed Date:09/28/2010

Opening Event Date:09/28/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:01/26/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:04/01/2011
Argued/Submitted:10/06/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/22/2011

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJoan Burt N
Donna M. BeasleyYY
AppellantJoseph Greene N
Donna M. BeasleyNY
AppelleeRiver Park Mutual Homes Inc.N
Patricia E. Bruce YN
Nicholas C. Erickson NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
09/28/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL (dwm)
10/21/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on September 28, 2010, it is ORDERED that appellants shall, within 20 days from the date of this order, complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellants must advise the Court Reporting Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. If partial transcripts are being ordered, appellants must file a statement of issues to be raised on appeal with this court within 10 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 10 (b)(3)(A). It is FURTHER ORDERED appellants' failure to respond to any order of this court, including this order, shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13(a). (JAC) elp
11/05/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT-NEEDED/RT-ORDERED for 4/23/10, 5/14/10 & 6/25/10) (elp) ****SEE JANUARY 21, 2011 ORDER********* (elp)
12/01/2010 On consideration of the Statement Regarding Transcript filed with this court of November 5, 2010, and it appearing that there is no order for transcript pending with the Court Reporting Division of the Superior Court, it is ORDERED that appellants shall within 15 days from the date of this order, advise this court as to the status of the transcripts. Failure to comply with this order shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice. (JAC) elp
12/22/2010ORDER: This appeal is hereby dismissed. See D.C. App. R. 13. (By: ETW)
12/22/2010DISMISSED
01/04/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO REINSTATE APPEAL
01/13/2011APPELLEE'S OPPOSITION- to aplt's motion for reinstatement (waiting on copies)
01/21/2011 On consideration of appellants' motion to reinstate appeal, and the opposition thereto, and it appearing that appellants have filed a statement regarding transcript with this court on November 5, 2010, listing various transcripts whereas appellants state in their motion to reinstate that no transcript is need for this appeal, it is ORDERED that appellants' motion to reinstate appeal is granted and this appeal is hereby reinstated. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Clerk of the Superior Court shall transmit the record index. It is (MORE)
01/21/2011 FURTHER ORDERED that appellants' brief and appendix shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 30, 31. (ETW) elp
01/26/2011RECORD INDEX
01/26/2011RECORD COMPLETED
02/17/2011APPEARANCE - of Patricia E. Bruce counsel for the aple (River Park Mutual Homes, Inc.) Address: 2200 Wilson Blvd, Suite 800, Arlington, VA 22201; Tel: 703-358-9620
02/28/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF w/ appendix attached
02/28/2011APPENDIX
03/08/2011COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASONS aple (opp) (elp) Granted
03/24/2011 On consideration of the motion of Richard D. Mirsky, Esquire, to withdraw his appearance and the appearances of co-counsel John Raftery, Esquire, and Todd Kelting, Esquire, as counsel of record for appellee, to which no opposition has been filed, and the appearance of Patricia E. Bruce, Esquire, as the counsel of record for appellee, and it appearing that appellants' brief and the appendix were fiiled with this court on February 28, 2011, it is ORDERED that the motion of Richard D. Mirsky, Esquire, is granted and his appearance and the appearances of co-counsel John Raftery, Esquire, and Todd Kelting, Esquire, are hereby withdrawn. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellee's brief remains due to be filed with this court on or before April 4, 2011. (ETW) elp
04/01/2011APPELLEE'S BRIEF
04/01/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
04/08/2011FiledFinal Screening - Regular
04/18/2011APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF
05/20/2011NOTICE RECEIVED -
05/20/2011CHANGE OF ADDRESS RECEIVED Patricia E. Bruce & Nicholas C. Erickson
06/21/2011 It appearing that this appeal is likely to be calendared for argument during the month(s) of Sept 2011 through Nov 2011, it is ORDERED that counsel shall advise this court in writing by July 15, 2011, of specific dates du ring that period when they are unavailable so that the court can attempt to avoid such dates in scheduling argument. (Please see the attached instruction sheet.) (aj) Julio Castillo Clerk
06/28/2011LETTER FROM COUNSEL/PARTY RE FUTURE CALENDARING aple
07/06/2011LETTER FROM COUNSEL/PARTY RE FUTURE CALENDARING APLT
07/26/2011FiledLetter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Appellee)
09/01/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
09/30/2011FiledRule 28(k) Citation Of Supplemental Authority (Appellee)
10/06/2011FiledArgued before Chief Judge Washington, Judges Glickman and King
10/28/2011FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Washington, Chief Judge, Glickman, Associate Judge, and King, Senior Judge.)
11/22/2011FiledMandate