judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

RONNIE L. COOK v. DANIEL L. SWIRES

Case Heading (S-08-0075)
Case Number:S-08-0075Case Docketed On:04/03/2008
Status:Closed
Original Court:Second Judicial District Albany CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Property, Conveyances and Security Transactions (Title 34)
Short Title:RONNIE L. COOK v. DANIEL L. SWIRES
Full Title:RONNIE L. COOK, Appellant (Defendant), v. DANIEL L. SWIRES, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantRonnie L. CookWilliam D. Bagley
AppelleeDaniel L. SwiresGreg Weisz

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Jurisdiction - Appellate, Property
Opinion Number:2009 WY 21
Citation:202 P.3d 397 (Wyo. 2009)

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
04/03/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
04/03/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
04/03/2008Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
04/03/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
04/17/2008Correspondence - Incoming from counsel for appellant re captionCorrespondenceIncomingFinal
04/24/2008Notice-Incoming - Entry of appearance by M. Gregory Weisz on behalf of appelleeNotice-IncomingEntry of appearanceFinal
05/06/2008Correspondence - Incoming - received letter from Mr. Bagley regarding the case caption - he believes other parties should be included.CorrespondenceIncomingFinal
05/06/2008Event - Phone Call - after reviewing all pleadings, contacted Mr. Greg Weisz regarding the parties and whether or not anyone else should be involved or listed in the caption. He indicated that he spoke to Ms. Tyler about this and only Mr. Swires is involved, and he does not believe anyone else needs to be included.EventPhone CallFinal
05/07/2008Correspondence - Outgoing - sent letter to Mr. Bagley regarding caption and decision not to revise.CorrespondenceOutgoingFinal
05/09/2008Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
06/24/2008Brief - Appellee and received copy of brief on cd and designation of recordBriefAppelleeFinal
06/30/2008Motion - Extension of time - brief, appellant's replyMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
06/30/2008Order - Denying appellant's request for extension to file reply briefOrderDenyFinal
07/02/2008Event - Phone Call from counsel for appellee re denying motion for extension of time; did not receive a copy from counsel for appellant, copy faxedEventPhone CallFinal
07/14/2008Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
07/14/2008Event - Hardcopy received - reply brief of appellant.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/15/2008Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
08/07/2008Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
08/07/2008Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, two volumes, original papers.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
08/07/2008Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
09/19/2008Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
09/24/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - M. Gregory Weisz for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
09/26/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - William Bagley for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
10/20/2008Order - Other - emergency order allowing four justices to hear oral argument, Justice Kite unavailableOrderOtherFinal
10/20/2008Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before Chief Justice Voigt, Justices Golden, Hill and Burke (William Bagley for appellant; Michael (Greg) G. Weisz for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
10/20/2008Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
02/19/2009Opinion - Opinion and journal order dismissing in part and affirming in part. Justice Kite writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
03/09/2009Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
03/09/2009Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
03/09/2009Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
03/09/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
03/11/2009Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 3/10/09.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal